Securities and Exchange Commission v. Sears et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: DeAndre P. Sears and MASears LLC doing business as PICASSO GROUP
Case Number: 8:2020cv03114
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Telephonic Status Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. On the date and time specified, counsel shall call the toll-free number at 1-888-684-8852 and enter the access code 2409734 followed by the security code 3114. The parties must use a land-based telephone. NO CELLULAR TELEPHONES. Although the hearing is taking place by telephone, the parties are hereby reminded that under Local Rule 5.01 the operation of recording or transmission devices, and the broadcasting or televising of proceedings in any courtroom or hearing room of this Court, or the environs thereof, either while the Court is in session or at recesses between sessions when Court officials, lawyers, jurors, witnesses or other persons connected with judicial proceedings of any kind are present, are prohibited.(BGS)
April 2, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell: TELEPHONE SATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/2/2021. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (BGS)
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. On the date and time specified, counsel shall call the toll-free number at 1-888-684-8852 and enter the access code 2409734 followed by the security code 3114. The parties must use a land-based telephone. NO CELLULAR TELEPHONES. Although the hearing is taking place by telephone, the parties are hereby reminded that under Local Rule 5.01 the operation of recording or transmission devices, and the broadcasting or televising of proceedings in any courtroom or hearing room of this Court, or the environs thereof, either while the Court is in session or at recesses between sessions when Court officials, lawyers, jurors, witnesses or other persons connected with judicial proceedings of any kind are present, are prohibited. (BGS)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT DEANDRE P. SEARS. The Clerk is ordered to enter this Judgment forthwith and without further notice. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/9/2021. (BGS)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT MASEARS LLC D/B/A PICASSO GROUP. The Clerk is ordered to enter this Judgment forthwith and without further notice. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/9/2021. (BGS)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion. The Judgments against the Defendants have been approved and will be entered. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/8/2021. (CEH)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion to be Excused From Filing a Case Management Report. The parties are relieved of their duty to prepare and file a case management report. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/26/2021. (GLP) Modified on 2/26/2021 (GLP).
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To Be Excused From Filing A Case Management Report as directed by the Court in its Related Case Order and Track Two Notice (DE 4) by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants' #14 Renewed Unopposed Motion for Permission for Thomas J. Krysa to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Additional Counsel of Record on Behalf of Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 2/18/2021. (ACL)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Thomas J. Krysa to appear pro hac vice (Renewed) by MASears LLC, DeAndre P. Sears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valiente, Lauren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' #12 Unopposed Motion for Permission for Thomas J. Krysa to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Additional Counsel of Record on Behalf of Defendants. It appears from the motion that the requirements of new Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(C), (D), (E), and (G) have not been met. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 2/9/2021.
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Thomas J. Krysa to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17843695 for $150 by DeAndre P. Sears. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valiente, Lauren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases listed in Rule 3.02(d). These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change in Local Rules. (BGS)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by MASears LLC, DeAndre P. Sears. (Valiente, Lauren)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Lisette Valiente on behalf of MASears LLC, DeAndre P. Sears (Valiente, Lauren)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Securities and Exchange Commission. Related case(s): yes (Johnson, Alise)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/4/2021. (BGS)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/4/2021. (BGS)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Entry of Judgments against Defendants DeAndre P. Sears and MASears LLC d/b/a Picasso Group and Notice of Filing Consents of Defendants to Entry of Judgments by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent of Defendant DeAndre P. Sears, #2 Exhibit B - Consent of Defendant MASears LLC d/b/a Picasso Group, #3 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit C- Judgment as to Defendant DeAndre P. Sears, #4 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit D- Judgment as to Defendant MASears LLC d/b/a Picasso Group)(Johnson, Alise)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-3114-T-36CPT. (LRB)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive And Other Relief against MASears LLC, DeAndre P. Sears filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Alise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Sears et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAndre P. Sears
Represented By: Thomas J. Krysa
Represented By: Lauren Lisette Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASears LLC doing business as PICASSO GROUP
Represented By: Thomas J. Krysa
Represented By: Lauren Lisette Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Alise M. Johnson
Represented By: Chanel Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?