Gaffney et al v. Ficarrotta et al
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Gaffney, Sarah Katherine Sussman, Sarah K Sussman as Trustee of the Sussman Family Trust and Sarah K. Sussman
Defendant: Judge Rex Barbas, Chief Judge Ronald Ficarrotta, State of Florida Department of Financial Services, State of Florida Division of Risk Management, Judge Paul Huey, Hillsborough County, Judge Caroline Tesche Arkin, Rex Barbas, State of Florida, Department of Financial Services, Ronald Ficarrotta, Paul Huey and Caroline Tesche Arkin
Case Number: 8:2021cv00021
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (McMullen, Sheldon)
March 2, 2021 Filing 30 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Teresa M. Gaffney, Sarah K. Sussman. (McMullen, Sheldon)
March 2, 2021 Filing 29 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Prejudice and Incorporated Request for Judicial Notice by Caroline Tesche Arkin(Individual Capacity; Judge), Caroline Tesche Arkin(Official Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Individual Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Official Capacity; Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Official Capacity; Chief Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Individual Capacity; Chief Judge), Paul Huey(Official Capacity; Judge), Paul Huey(Individual Capacity; Judge). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Judge Huey, #2 Exhibit Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Motion to disqualify, #4 Exhibit Order Judge Barbas, #5 Exhibit Final Judgment, #6 Exhibit 2nd DCA Opinion, #7 Exhibit Final Judgment Judge Arkin, #8 Exhibit Civil Contempt Order, #9 Exhibit Motion to Disqualify Recuse, #10 Exhibit State court docket 14-ca-3762, #11 Exhibit Fedreral Bankruptcy court order, #12 Exhibit July 7, 2020 Opinion of the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals)(Rives, Marie)
March 2, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hillsborough County. (Todd, Stephen)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26--motion for an extension of time; directing Hillsborough County to respond to the plaintiffs' prospective second amended complaint within twenty days after the filing of the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/1/2021. (BK)
February 26, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint by Hillsborough County. (Todd, Stephen)
February 25, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GSO)
February 25, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of a related action Second Amended per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Caroline Tesche Arkin(Individual Capacity; Judge), Caroline Tesche Arkin(Official Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Individual Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Official Capacity; Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Official Capacity; Chief Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Individual Capacity; Chief Judge), Paul Huey(Official Capacity; Judge), Paul Huey(Individual Capacity; Judge). Related case(s): Yes (Rives, Marie)
February 25, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Hillsborough County. Related case(s): No (Todd, Stephen)
February 9, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Todd on behalf of Hillsborough County (Todd, Stephen)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS issued as to Hillsborough County. (JLD)
January 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Caroline Tesche Arkin(Individual Capacity; Judge), Caroline Tesche Arkin(Official Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Individual Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Official Capacity; Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Official Capacity; Chief Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Individual Capacity; Chief Judge), Paul Huey(Official Capacity; Judge), Paul Huey(Individual Capacity; Judge). Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Rives, Marie)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #18 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act, as to James J. Macchitelli. If counsel has not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/20/2021. (CTB)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for James J. Macchitelli to appear pro hac vice by Teresa M. Gaffney, Sarah K. Sussman. (McMullen, Sheldon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 19, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. 113A-17784549 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney James J. Macchitelli. (McMullen, Sheldon)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Caroline Tesche Arkin(Individual Capacity; Judge), Caroline Tesche Arkin(Official Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Individual Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Official Capacity; Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Official Capacity; Chief Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Individual Capacity; Chief Judge), Paul Huey(Official Capacity; Judge), Paul Huey(Individual Capacity; Judge). Related case(s): Yes (Rives, Marie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/13/2021 by Caroline Tesche Arkin(Individual Capacity; Judge), Caroline Tesche Arkin(Official Capacity; Judge) as to Caroline Tesche Arkin(Individual Capacity; Judge), Caroline Tesche Arkin(Official Capacity; Judge). (Rives, Marie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/13/2021 by Rex Barbas(Individual Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Official Capacity; Judge) as to Rex Barbas(Individual Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Official Capacity; Judge). (Rives, Marie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/13/2021 by Ronald Ficarrotta(Official Capacity; Chief Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Individual Capacity; Chief Judge) as to Ronald Ficarrotta(Official Capacity; Chief Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Individual Capacity; Chief Judge). (Rives, Marie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/13/2021 by Paul Huey(Official Capacity; Judge), Paul Huey(Individual Capacity; Judge) as to Paul Huey(Official Capacity; Judge), Paul Huey(Individual Capacity; Judge). (Rives, Marie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie T. Rives on behalf of Ronald Ficarrotta(Official Capacity; Chief Judge), Ronald Ficarrotta(Individual Capacity; Chief Judge) (Rives, Marie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie T. Rives on behalf of Paul Huey(Official Capacity; Judge), Paul Huey(Individual Capacity; Judge) (Rives, Marie)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie T. Rives on behalf of Rex Barbas(Individual Capacity; Judge), Rex Barbas(Official Capacity; Judge) (Rives, Marie)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Teresa M. Gaffney, Sarah K. Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sussman, Dov)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie T. Rives on behalf of Caroline Tesche Arkin(Individual Capacity; Judge), Caroline Tesche Arkin(Official Capacity; Judge) (Rives, Marie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE: COMPLIANCE WITH NEW LOCAL RULE 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/11/2021. (GSO)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/8/2021. (GSO)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel James J. Macchitelli of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRH)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Dov Sussman of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRH)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:21-cv-0021-T-23CPT. (SJB)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sussman, Dov)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaffney et al v. Ficarrotta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Rex Barbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Judge Ronald Ficarrotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida Department of Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida Division of Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Paul Huey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County
Represented By: Stephen M. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Caroline Tesche Arkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Barbas
Represented By: Marie T. Rives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida, Department of Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Ficarrotta
Represented By: Marie T. Rives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Huey
Represented By: Marie T. Rives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Tesche Arkin
Represented By: Marie T. Rives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Gaffney
Represented By: Dov Sussman
Represented By: James J. Macchitelli
Represented By: Sheldon Davis McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Katherine Sussman
Represented By: Dov Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah K Sussman as Trustee of the Sussman Family Trust
Represented By: Dov Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah K. Sussman
Represented By: Dov Sussman
Represented By: James J. Macchitelli
Represented By: Sheldon Davis McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?