Negron v. Nesco Resource LLC
Plaintiff: Mirna Negron
Defendant: Nesco Resource LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00224
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of the #15 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/19/2021. (CCB)
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Mirna Negron. (Cabassa, Luis)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 60-DAY ORDER dismissing case in accordance with attached order. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/4/2021. (CCB)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of settlement by Mirna Negron. (Cabassa, Luis)
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nesco Resource LLC. Related case(s): No. (Kelly, Brian) Modified text on 3/3/2021 (LNR).
March 1, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brian J. Kelly (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063315.) Related document: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Brian J. Kelly to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Brian J. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/24/2021. (DMS)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Brian J. Kelly to appear pro hac vice by Nesco Resource LLC. (Kelly, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Nesco Resource LLC. (Mooney, Nichole)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Nesco Resource LLC.(Mooney, Nichole)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on February 2, 2021 by Mirna Negron as to Nesco Resource LLC. (Cabassa, Luis)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SAO)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SAO)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Nesco Resource LLC. (JLD)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-0224-T-02TGW. (SJB)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Nesco Resource LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17824013) filed by Mirna Negron. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cabassa, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negron v. Nesco Resource LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nesco Resource LLC
Represented By: Nichole M. Mooney
Represented By: Brian J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirna Negron
Represented By: Luis A. Cabassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?