Freedom Investments Systems LLC v. Jain et al
Plaintiff: Freedom Investments Systems LLC a Florida Limited Liability Company doing business as The Glassman
Defendant: Mary Beth Valley, Usha Jain, Manohar H. Jain, Roetzel & Andress, L.P.A., Michael Furbush and David Barker
Case Number: 8:2021cv00238
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 22 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #21 Notice of Appeal. (CTR)
March 25, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #18 Order on Motion to VacateOrder on Motion to Withdraw, #10 Order on Motion to DismissOrder on Motion to Remand to State Court by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. Filing fee not paid. (CTR)
March 10, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File to file a Notice of Appeal by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. (AG)
March 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Joint Motion of Minority Doctor Usha Jain and Manohar Jain for Notifying the Court of Violation of Local Rule 1.04(B) by Judge Merryday by Not Transferring the Case to the Orlando Division along with Violation of Jurisdictional Requirement by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. (JLD)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #15--construed motion for reconsideration; denying as moot #17--motion to withdraw Doc. #13. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/22/2021. (BK)
February 17, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw #13 JOINT MOTION for new evidence of derivation of their Rights by newly assigned Judge Ashton by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. (AG)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #11, #12, and #13--motions by Usha Jain and Monohar Jain for leave to access CM/ECF. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/16/2021. (BK)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Rescind #10 Order of Judge Steven D. Merryday due to lack of jurisdiction by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. (AG)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of intent to file a timely oppose memorandum to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Remand for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, for Immediate Remand, Motion to Shorten Time for Response by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. (AG)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION for new evidence of derivation of their Rights by newly assigned Judge Ashton by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AG)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay the proceedings in the state court due to lack of jurisdiction as removal notice filed in Federal Court in Tampa by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. (AG)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION for leave from Court to file the Claims Electronically by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain. (AG)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 and #8--motions to remand; denying #8--motion to assess an attorney's fee; warning the Jains that a further baseless removal subjects the Jains to the assessment against them of an attorney's fee, costs, and expenses; directing the clerk to MAIL a certified copy of this order to the clerk of the Ninth Judicial Circuit Court in Orange County, Florida, to TERMINATE any pending motion, and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/10/2021. (BK)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED document by Freedom Investments Systems LLC. Amended Certificate of Servie of Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Remand for Lack of Jurisdiction in Response to Notice of Removal and for Imposition of Attorneys Fees as Costs. (Kalmanson, Barry)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Jurisdiction in Response to Notice of Removal and for Imposition of Attorneys Fees as Costs by Freedom Investments Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(Kalmanson, Barry)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED document by David Barker, Michael Furbush, Mary Beth Valley. Amendment to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Remand for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, for Immediate Remand, Motion to Shorten Time for Response, and Memorandum of Law Amended Certificate of Service. (Wert, Thomas)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Remand for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, for Immediate Remand, Motion to Shorten Time for Response, and Memorandum of Law by David Barker, Michael Furbush, Mary Beth Valley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wert, Thomas)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Wert on behalf of David Barker, Mary Beth Valley (Wert, Thomas)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Furbush on behalf of Michael Furbush (Furbush, Michael)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/5/2021. (GSO)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2): -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GSO)
February 4, 2021 FEES paid by Manohar H. Jain, Usha Jain (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number TPA063111). (JLD)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2016-CA-08318-0 and 2016-7260-0 filed in State Court on 09/19/2016. filed by Usha Jain, Manohar H. Jain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(AG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Investments Systems LLC v. Jain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Valley
Represented By: David Joseph Lienhart
Represented By: Thomas P. Wert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Usha Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manohar H. Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roetzel & Andress, L.P.A.
Represented By: David Joseph Lienhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Furbush
Represented By: Michael J. Furbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Barker
Represented By: David Joseph Lienhart
Represented By: Thomas P. Wert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Investments Systems LLC a Florida Limited Liability Company doing business as The Glassman
Represented By: Barry Kalmanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?