Pizarro v. Paizes
Plaintiff: Jose A Pizarro and Jose A. Pizarro
Defendant: Spiro C Paizes and Spiro C. Paizes
Case Number: 8:2021cv00303
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #14), this case is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and thereafter close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/16/2021. (AR)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Jose A. Pizarro. (Bridges, Gennifer)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Spiro C. Paizes.(JLD) Modified on 3/8/2021 (JLD).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by March 23, 2021, file a completed Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/23/2021. (AR)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Jose A. Pizarro (Bridges, Gennifer)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule 3.03 by Jose A. Pizarro. (Bridges, Gennifer)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/10/2021. (TWL)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TWL)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (JLD)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Spiro C. Paizes. (JLD)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-0303-VMC-SPF. (SJB)
February 9, 2021 REFUND for payment. Case 8:21cv302 was deleted. Receipt number 113A-17862868 refunded in the amount of $ 402.00 paid to Gennifer Lynn Bridges.. (NLC)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spiro C. Paizes with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17862887) filed by Jose A Pizarro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bridges, Gennifer) Modified text on 2/11/2021 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizarro v. Paizes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A Pizarro
Represented By: Gennifer Lynn Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Pizarro
Represented By: Gennifer Lynn Bridges
Represented By: Howard S. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spiro C Paizes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spiro C. Paizes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?