Donelon et al v. Pollick et al
Plaintiff: James J. Donelon
Defendant: Dennis P. Neyland, Katrina Rigali Trump, antonio scognamiglio, Jeffrey C. Pollick, Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida doing business as Seacoast National Bank, Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation and The Bank of Tampa
Case Number: 8:2021cv00436
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ENDORSED ORDER granting #132 Motion to Withdraw Leake & Andersson, LLP as Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/15/2021. (SRC)
April 13, 2021 Filing 149 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint /Plaintiff's Petition for Damages and Jury Demand by Jeffrey C. Pollick.(Barrasso, Judy)
April 12, 2021 Filing 148 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey C. Pollick identifying Corporate Parent Jeffrey C Pollick for Jeffrey C. Pollick.. (Barrasso, Judy)
April 12, 2021 Filing 147 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Barrasso, Judy)
April 12, 2021 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The Bank of Tampa identifying Corporate Parent Tampa Bay Banking Company for The Bank of Tampa.. (Burns, James)
April 12, 2021 Filing 145 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Katrina Rigali Trump. (Merenda, Brigid)
April 12, 2021 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (Ellison, Jason)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant Jeffrey C. Pollick's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Damages" (Doc. #139) is granted. Pollick may file his response to the petition for damages on or before April 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/31/2021. (EKB)
March 30, 2021 Filing 142 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by The Bank of Tampa.(Burns, James)
March 30, 2021 Filing 141 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Katrina Rigali Trump.(Merenda, Brigid)
March 30, 2021 Filing 140 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida.(Ellison, Jason)
March 29, 2021 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DAMAGES by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Dressel, Robert)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ENDORSED ORDER granting #135, #136, #137 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Judy Y. Barrasso, Michael A. Balascio, and Robert J. Dressel may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel complete the E-Filer Registration for access to CM/ECF (https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/webforms/e-filer-registration-form) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/18/2021. (MLM)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant Capitol Specialty Insurance Company Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Damages" (Doc. #133) is granted. Capitol Specialty Insurance Company may file its response to the petition for damages on or before March 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/18/2021. (EKB)
March 17, 2021 Filing 137 EX PARTE MOTION for Robert J. Dressel to appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 17, 2021 Filing 136 EX PARTE MOTION for Michael A. Balascio to appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 17, 2021 Filing 135 EX PARTE MOTION for Judy Y. Barrasso to appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 17, 2021 Filing 133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant Capitol Specialty Insurance Company Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond To Petition for Damages by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Aebel, Bruce)
March 17, 2021 Filing 132 MOTION to Withdraw Defendant Capitol Specialty Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Leake & Andersson LLP as Counsel by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Aebel, Bruce)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant Jeffrey C. Pollick's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Damages" (Doc. #128) is granted. Pollick may file his response to the petition for damages on or before March 30, 2021. Counsel for Pollick are directed to comply with the requirements for special admission to practice in the Middle District of Florida. See (Doc. #129). Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/17/2021. (EKB)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ENDORSED ORDER: "The Unopposed Motion by Defendant Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida d/b/a Seacoast National Bank for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Damages and Jury Demand (Doc. 01)" (Doc. #124) is granted. Defendant Seacoast Banking may file its response to the petition for damages on or before March 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/17/2021. (EKB)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying without prejudice #125, #126, #127 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/17/2021. (MLM)
March 17, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Judy Y. Barrasso, appearing on behalf of Jeffrey C. Pollick (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063440.) Related document: #125 MOTION for Judy Y. Barrasso to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 17, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Robert J. Dressel, appearing on behalf of Jeffrey C. Pollick (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063439.) Related document: #126 MOTION for Robert J. Dressel to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 17, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael A. Balascio, appearing on behalf of Jeffrey C. Pollick (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063441.) Related document: #127 MOTION for Michael Anthony Balascio to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 128 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (JLD)
March 16, 2021 Filing 127 EX-PARTE MOTION for Michael Anthony Balascio to appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 16, 2021 Filing 126 EX-PARTE MOTION for Robert J. Dressel to appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 16, 2021 Filing 125 EX-PARTE MOTION for Judy Y. Barrasso to appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified on 3/16/2021 (JLD).
March 16, 2021 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (Ellison, Jason)
March 16, 2021 Filing 123 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Crane Lieb on behalf of Katrina Rigali Trump (Lieb, Stephanie)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant, Katrina Rigali Trump's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Damages and Jury Demand" (Doc. #120) is granted. Trump may file her response to the petition for damages on or before March 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/16/2021. (EKB)
March 16, 2021 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal by Katrina Rigali Trump. (Merenda, Brigid)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ENDORSED ORDER granting #118 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Bradley Arthur Muhs and Brigid Anne Merenda added for Katrina Rigali Trump. Attorneys James A. Brown and Melanie N. Derefinko terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/15/2021. (MLM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Katrina Rigali Trump. (Merenda, Brigid) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant The Bank of Tampa's unopposed motion for extension of time (Doc. #116) is granted. The Bank of Tampa may file its response to the petition for damages on or before March 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/15/2021. (EKB)
March 12, 2021 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Damages and Jury Demand by The Bank of Tampa. (Johnson, John)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ENDORSED ORDER granting #114 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys James Jeffrey Burns and John E. Johnson added for The Bank of Tampa. Attorneys Walter Frederick Metzinger, III, Nicholas John Wehlen, W. Brett Mason, and Michael W. McKay terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/12/2021. (MLM)
March 12, 2021 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by The Bank of Tampa. (Johnson, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 11, 2021 Filing 113 NOTICE of Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Appearance by Bruce A. Aebel on behalf of Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation (Aebel, Bruce)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ENDORSED ORDER granting #111 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Loretta G. Mince, Michael R. Dodson, and Lance C. McCardle terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/5/2021. (MLM)
March 5, 2021 Filing 111 MOTION for to Withdraw as Attorney by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Ellison, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 3, 2021 Filing 110 NOTICE to counsel George Davidson Fagan and Adam David Whitworth of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
March 3, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE to counsel James A. Brown, A'Dair Ragan Flynt, Melanie N. Derefinko of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
March 3, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE to counsel Loretta Gallaher Mince, Lance C. McCardle and Michael Ryan Dodson of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
March 3, 2021 Filing 107 NOTICE to counsel W. Brett Mason, Michsel W. McKay, Nicholas John Wehlen and Walter Frederick Metzinger, III of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
March 3, 2021 Filing 106 NOTICE to counsel Shelton Dennis Blunt, Alfred Paul LeBlanc, Jr., and Brittany Holt Alexander of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
March 3, 2021 Filing 105 NOTICE to counsel Judy Y. Barrasso and Michael Anthony Balascio of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
March 3, 2021 Filing 104 NOTICE to counsel Joseph E. Cullens, Jr., Andree Matherne Cullens, and Stepehn Layne Lee of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
March 2, 2021 Filing 103 TRANSFER IN from the Middle District of Louisiana. Case assigned to District Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda S. Sansone. New Case Number: 8:21-cv-436-TPB-AAS. (AG)
March 2, 2021 Filing 102 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00177. File received electronically
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RULING AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion to Dismiss. ; granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion to Dismiss. ; granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion to Transfer Case ; denying #24 Motion for Expedited Hearing on ; granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion to Dismiss. ; denying #30 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #30 Motion for Discovery; denying #38 Motion for Joinder; granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this action to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/2/2021. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/11/2021. (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RULING AND ORDER Adopting #87 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's #23 Motion for Remand is DENIED. Plaintiff's claims against Dennis P. Neyland are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's #22 Motion for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand are DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/10/2020. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 97 RESPONSE to #88 Objections to #87 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation filed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #95 Ex Parte Motion For Leave to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation including Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/5/2020. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 95 Ex Parte Motion For Leave to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's #88 Objections to Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation including Motion to Exceed Page Limit, by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Order)(LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw/Strike Previously Filed Pleading and Substitute Attached Pleading for Same. Record Doc. No. 92 is withdrawn and stricken from the record. Defendant's proposed pleading, Record Doc. 93-1, 93-2, shall be entered as a separate docket entry and deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/4/2020. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #93 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw/Strike Previously Filed Pleading and Substitute Attached Pleading for Same. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
November 3, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #93 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw/Strike Previously Filed Pleading and Substitute Attached Pleading for Same. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 93 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw/Strike Previously Filed Pleading and Substitute Attached Pleading for Same by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation, Dennis P. Neyland, Antonio Scognamiglio, The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Leave and to Exceed Page Limit, #2 Proposed Pleading; Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate's R&R, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Whitworth, Adam) Modified on 11/3/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). Added MOTION to Substitute on 11/3/2020 (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 92 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD RESPONSE to #88 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation, Dennis P. Neyland, Antonio Scognamiglio, The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump. (Whitworth, Adam) Modified on 11/4/2020 to withdraw and strike document as per Order #94 (LLH). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Substitute Pleading. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 90-1 in place of R. Doc. 89. The #89 Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record is GRANTED as substituted. Attorney Melanie N Derefinko is substituted as co-counsel for defendant Katrina Rigali Trump replacing A'Dair R. Flynt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 90 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Pleading Melanie N. Derefinko in place of A'Dair R. Flynt as Attorney of Record by Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Pleading)(Brown, James) Modified on 10/20/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
October 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #89 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Melanie N. Derefinko in place of A'Dair R. Flynt as Attorney for Katrina Rigali Trump. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
October 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #90 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Melanie N. Derefinko in place of A'Dair R. Flynt as Attorney of RecordEx Parte MOTION to Substitute Pleading Melanie N. Derefinko in place of A'Dair R. Flynt as Attorney of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 89 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Melanie N. Derefinko in place of A'Dair R. Flynt as Attorney for Katrina Rigali Trump by Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James) (Main Document 89 replaced on 10/26/2020 in accordance with RD 91) (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 88 OBJECTION to #87 Report and Recommendations filed by James J. Donelon. (Cullens, Andree) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 87 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand filed by James J. Donelon, #23 MOTION to Remand filed by James J. Donelon. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that Plaintiff's #23 Motion for Remand be DENIED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims against Dennis P. Neyland be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's #22 Motion for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/2/2020. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 86 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #29 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer filed by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Balascio, Michael) Modified on 6/25/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #80 Motion to Strike. Document 78 shall be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/19/2020. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 84 REPLY to #81 Memorandum in Opposition to #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dennis P. Neyland, Antonio Scognamiglio. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/22/2020. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #31 Motion to Dismiss by Dennis P. Neyland, Antonio Scognamiglio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Blunt, Shelton) Modified on 6/17/2020 to link the entries and edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 81 Opposition to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) [ECF NO. 31] filed by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Cullens, Andree) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 80 Motion to Strike ECF Document 78 by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Cullens, Andree) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 79 Opposition to #29 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or Alternatively to Transfer Venue filed by James J. Donelon. (Cullens, Andree) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 78 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Opposition to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) [ECF NO. 31] filed by James J. Donelon. (Cullens, Andree) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit text (LT). Modified on 6/22/2020 to remove document in accordance with RD 85 (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 77 REPLY to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to, #61 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (McCardle, Lance) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 76 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #18 Bank of Tampa's MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by The Bank of Tampa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Affidavit, #2 Ex. 1 Substitution of Collateral Agreement, #3 Ex 2 CD Hold Report)(Mason, W.) Modified on 6/9/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 75 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Supplemental Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Brown, James) Modified on 6/4/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY to #46 Memorandum in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand, filed by James J. Donelon. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 73 REPLY to #45 Memorandum in Opposition to #30 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Defendants' Personal Jurisdiction and Alternative Motion to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by James J. Donelon. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 72 REPLY to #44 Memorandum in Opposition to #23 MOTION to Remand filed by James J. Donelon. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 71 REPLY to #43 Memorandum in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand, filed by James J. Donelon. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 70 REPLY to #42 Memorandum in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand, filed by James J. Donelon. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 69 REPLY to #41 Memorandum in Opposition to #23 MOTION to Remand filed by James J. Donelon. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #62 #63 #64 #65 #66 #67 MOTIONS for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/29/2020. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #46 Opposition by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply to Opposition)(Cullens, Joseph) Modified on 5/28/2020 to link documents (SWE).[Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #45 Opposition by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply to Opposition)(Cullens, Joseph) Modified on 5/28/2020 to link documents (SWE).[Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #44 Opposition by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply to Response)(Cullens, Joseph) Modified on 5/28/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #43 Opposition by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply to Opposition)(Cullens, Joseph) Modified on 5/28/2020 to link documents (SWE).[Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #42 Opposition by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply to Opposition)(Cullens, Joseph) Modified on 5/28/2020 to link documents (SWE).[Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum#41 to Opposition by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply to Opposition)(Cullens, Joseph) Modified on 5/28/2020 to link documents (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #62 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #41 Opposition . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #64 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #43 Opposition . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #67 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #46 Opposition . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #65 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #44 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #63 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to #42 Opposition . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to filed by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cullens, Andree) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #18 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cullens, Andree) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #51 Joint Motion for Extension of Time by All Parties. The scheduling conference and status report deadlines are CANCELLED pending resolution of R. Docs. 15, 18, 21, 22, 23, 29 and 31. The parties shall contact the chambers of the undersigned upon resolution of these motions should a scheduling conference be necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #49 Ex Parte Motion for Visiting Attorney to Participate in a Particular Case. Attorney Jason M. Ellison is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for defendant Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY to #34 Memorandum in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand filed by James J. Donelon. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by James J. Donelon. The Reply [54-2] shall be filed into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Strike. The Reply [R. Doc. 52] shall be struck. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 22, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 53 First MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 52 Response , #54 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 54 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Attachment Reply to Opposition)(Cullens, Andree) Modified on 5/22/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 52 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Reply to #34 Memorandum in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand filed by James J. Donelon. (Cullens, Joseph) Modified on 5/21/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). Modified on 5/22/2020 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 55 (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by All Parties by James J. Donelon by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation, Dennis P. Neyland, Jeffrey C. Pollick, Antonio Scognamiglio, Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida, The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Balascio, Michael) Modified on 5/21/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #29 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer. Plaintiff shall file his oppositions to Defendants Motions to Dismiss on or before 6/11/2020. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/20/2020. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 21, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by All Parties. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Jason M. Ellison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2115980) by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Attachment Affidavit of Jason M. Ellison, #3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(McCardle, Lance) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #49 MOTION for Jason M. Ellison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2115980). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 48 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition #29 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Cullens, Andree) Modified on 5/19/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 47 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Cullens, Andree) Modified on 5/19/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand filed by The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump. (Brown, James) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #30 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Defendants' Motions Regarding Personal Jurisdiction Until After Subject Matter Jurisdiction has been Determined MOTION to Connduct jurisdictional Discovery Prio to any Consideration of Defendants' Motions Regarding Personal Jurisdiction filed by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (McCardle, Lance) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #23 MOTION to Remand filed by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (McCardle, Lance) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand filed by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (McCardle, Lance) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand filed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Whitworth, Adam) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #23 MOTION to Remand filed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation, The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whitworth, Adam) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM In Support of #24 Motion for Katrina Rigali Trump and The Bank of Tampa for Priority Consideration of their #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #18 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Katrina Rigali Trump. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Priority Consideration. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/13/2020. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Join and Adopt #24 Motion for Priority Consideration of #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #18 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 5/12/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #24 Motion for Katrina Rigali Trump and The Bank of Tampa for Priority Consideration of their #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #18 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (McCardle, Lance) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Priority Consideration by The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Brown, James) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #30 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Defendants' Motions Regarding Personal Jurisdiction Until After Subject Matter Jurisdiction has been Determined MOTION to Connduct jurisdictional Discovery Prio to any Consideration of Defendants' Motions Regarding Personal Jurisdiction filed by The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump. (Brown, James) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand filed by Dennis P. Neyland, Antonio Scognamiglio. (Blunt, Shelton) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to. Opposition due by 5/26/2020 (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines:Opposition to Motion to Dismiss due by 5/26/2020 (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to . Plaintiff's Opposition due on or before 5/26/2020. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/6/2020. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Alfred Paul LeBlanc, Jr. is enrolled as co-counsel for defendants Dennis P. Neyland and Antonio Scognamiglio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/4/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dennis P. Neyland, Antonio Scognamiglio. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Blunt, Shelton) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Defer Consideration of Defendants' Motions Regarding Personal Jurisdiction Until After Subject Matter Jurisdiction has been Determined, or in the Alternative, Motion to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery Prior to any Consideration of Defendants' Motions Regarding Personal Jurisdiction by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Cullens, Andree). Added MOTION for Discovery on 5/5/2020 (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A-Jeffery C. Pollick Affidavit)(Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 28 Opposition to #24 Motion for Katrina Rigali Trump and The Bank of Tampa for Priority Consideration of their MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by James J. Donelon. (Cullens, Andree) Modified on 4/30/2020 to edit text (LT).[Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 27 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Paul Leblanc as Additional Attorney by Dennis P. Neyland, Antonio Scognamiglio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Blunt, Shelton) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 30, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Paul Leblanc as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #15 #18 MOTIONS to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Responses due by 5/26/2020. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/29/2020. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 25 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Cullens, Andree) Modified on 4/28/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 Motion for Katrina Rigali Trump and The Bank of Tampa for Priority Consideration of their #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #18 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Brown, James) Modified on 4/27/2020 to edit text (LT). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 24, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #23 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Cullens, Andree) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Petition - Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(Cullens, Andree) Modified on 4/23/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(McCardle, Lance). Added MOTION to Transfer Case to on 4/23/2020 (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 20 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #18 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by James J. Donelon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Cullens, Andree) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 23, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Petition for Damages and Jury Demand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 19 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation.(Whitworth, Adam) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by The Bank of Tampa. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Ex. A Affidavit, #3 Ex. B Promissory Note, #4 Ex. C Commerical Guaranties, #5 Proposed Order)(Mason, W.) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 17 First Amended Notice of Removal by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation, The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump re #1 Notice of Removal, #13 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Brown, James) Modified on 4/16/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Further Extension of Time. Defendants Dennis P. Neyland, Jeffrey C. Pollick, Antonio Scognamiglio, Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida, and The Bank of Tampa are granted an extension of time until 4/30/2020 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Katrina Trump)(Brown, James) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, Attachment #1 by Dennis P. Neyland, Jeffrey C. Pollick, Antonio Scognamiglio, Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida, The Bank of Tampa. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 14, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, Attachment #1. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before 04/27/20200, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of defendants The Bank of Tampa and Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 04/13/2020. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 6/11/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 5/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/9/2020. (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Jeffrey C. Pollick is granted an extension of time until 4/15/2020 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Jeffrey C. Pollick. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Balascio, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2020 (SGO). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 and #8 Ex Parte Motions for Extension of Time. Defendant The Bank of Tampa is granted an extension until 4/15/2020 to answer or otherwise plead. Defendants Dennis P. Neyland and Antonio Scognamiglio are granted an extension until 4/21/2020 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/31/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by Dennis P. Neyland, Antonio Scognamiglio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Blunt, Shelton) Modified on 3/31/2020 (SGO). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 31, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 31, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time responsive pleadings by The Bank of Tampa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Mason, W.) Modified on 3/31/2020 (SGO). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 30, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time responsive pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation.(Whitworth, Adam) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 and #4 Ex Parte Motions for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendants Katrina Rigali Trump and Seacost Banking Corporation of Florida are granted an extension of time until 4/15/2020 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCardle, Lance) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 26, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleading by Katrina Rigali Trump. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James) Modified on 3/27/2020 (SGO). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of To Adverse Parties of Removal by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation, The Bank of Tampa, Katrina Rigali Trump (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Notice to State Court of Removal)(Brown, James) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 25, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 25, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleading. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana, Case Number C-694171. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2093373), filed by Katrina Rigali Trump, The Bank of Tampa, Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Consents, #3 Exhibit SOS Screenshots, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitworth, Adam) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/25/2020) (EDC). Modified on 3/25/2020 to rotate pages. (EDC). [Transferred from lamd on 3/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donelon et al v. Pollick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis P. Neyland
Represented By: Brittany Holt Alexander
Represented By: Alfred Paul LeBlanc, Jr.
Represented By: Shelton Dennis Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Rigali Trump
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Represented By: Melanie N Derefinko
Represented By: James A. Brown
Represented By: Brigid Anne Merenda
Represented By: Bradley Arthur Muhs
Represented By: Stephanie Crane Lieb
Represented By: Melanie N. Derefinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: antonio scognamiglio
Represented By: Brittany Holt Alexander
Represented By: Alfred Paul LeBlanc, Jr.
Represented By: Shelton Dennis Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C. Pollick
Represented By: Judy Y. Barrasso
Represented By: Michael Anthony Balascio
Represented By: Robert J. Dressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seacoast Banking Corporation of Florida doing business as Seacoast National Bank
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Lance C. McCardle
Represented By: Jason M. Ellison
Represented By: Loretta Gallaher Mince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Represented By: Adam David Whitworth
Represented By: Bruce A. Aebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Tampa
Represented By: W. Brett Mason
Represented By: Michael W. McKay
Represented By: Walter Frederick Metzinger, III
Represented By: Nicholas John Wehlen
Represented By: John Eamon Johnson
Represented By: James Jeffrey Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Donelon
Represented By: Stephen Layne Lee
Represented By: Joseph (J.) E. Cullens, Jr.
Represented By: Andree Matherne Cullens
Represented By: Joseph E. Cullens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?