Rose v. Davis
Plaintiff: Wolton Rose
Defendant: Jessica Davis
Case Number: 8:2021cv00685
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Transmittal of Record to State Court by the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Hillsborough County, Florida. (LD)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This action is remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Once remand is effected, the Clerk is directed to close this case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/25/2021. (ANL)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Jessica Davis. (TDC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 EMERGENCY COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, FL, case number 21-CC-001064 filed in State Court on 1/7/2021, filed by Jessica Davis. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(TDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolton Rose
Represented By: Jeffery Merrell Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?