Smiley v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Smiley
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Champion Mortgage Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00717
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn K Mizelle
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to to Set Aside Clerk Default with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Foreclosure Docket, #2 Exhibit Federal Order Dismissing Case, #3 Exhibit Motion to Substitute, #4 Exhibit Foreclosure Order)(Rottmann, Emily) Modified event on 5/21/2021 (AG).
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen D. Kilbride on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Kilbride, Kathleen)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Yandle Rottmann on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Rottmann, Emily)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara F. Holladay on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Holladay, Sara)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nathaniel Smiley. (JLD)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerk's Default against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Hayes, Carl) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 4/15/2021 by Nathaniel Smiley as to All Defendants. (Hayes, Carl)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after any defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/26/2021. (AS)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (JLD)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage LLC with Jury Demand filed by Nathaniel Smiley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 notice of appearance)(Hayes, Carl)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-0717-KKM-AAS. (SJB)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 *** Terminated complaint. Counsel refiled with attachments on docket 3. ***COMPLAINT against Nathaniel Smiley with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-18047106) filed by Nathaniel Smiley.(Hayes, Carl) Modified on 3/26/2021 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smiley v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Smiley
Represented By: Carl Roland Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Champion Mortgage Company
Represented By: Sara F. Holladay
Represented By: Kathleen D. Kilbride
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?