Owens v. Resurgent Capital Services et al
Plaintiff: Iasia Owens
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, Sterling Jewelers, Inc., Resurgent Capital Services and Credit Control, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00852
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/28/2021. (MWC)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Resurgent Capital Services. (Marees, II, John)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/13/2021. (MWC)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 Joint NOTICE of settlement by Resurgent Capital Services. (Marees, II, John) Modified on 5/12/2021 (TDC).
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Marees, II on behalf of Resurgent Capital Services. (Marees, II, John) Modified on 5/12/2021 (TDC).
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Credit Control, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, Sterling Jewelers, Inc., Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB filed by Iasia Owens. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Iasia Owens. (Attachments: #1 Attachment- Civil Cover Sheet)(TDC)
May 7, 2021 FEES paid by Iasia Owens (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number TPA63874). (ARC)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #7 Defendant Credit Control Services LLC's Amended Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint; DENYING AS MOOT #6 Defendant Credit Control Services LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant seeks an extension of time to May 17, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The request is denied without prejudice as premature. Plaintiff is proceeding pro se in this action and has neither paid the filing fee nor been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. In addition, the Clerk has yet to issue any summonses, and Defendant does not indicate that it has waived service. Because Defendant has yet to be properly served in this action, its obligation to answer the Complaint within the responsive pleading deadline has not been triggered. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(1)(A)(i) ("A defendant must serve an answer[ ] within 21 days after being served with the summons and complaint."). If appropriate, Defendant may renew its extension request once it has been properly served. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/4/2021. (MWC)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Credit Control, LLC. (Golden, Dale)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Credit Control, LLC. (Spengler, Sangeeta)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk is directed to include with a copy of this Order a Long Form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/12/2021. (DMS)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to the Court to take Judicial Notice and MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Iasia Owens. (JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit Control, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, Sterling Jewelers, Inc., Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB filed by Iasia Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed USM 285)(JLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Resurgent Capital Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Jewelers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services
Represented By: John Michael Marees, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Control, LLC
Represented By: Dale Thomas Golden
Represented By: Sangeeta Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iasia Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?