U.S. Bank Equipment Finance v. Gulf Coast JJ'S - ST. Pete III, LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Equipment Finance
Defendant: Gulf Coast JJ's - Bee Ridge, Leslie Weber, Gulf Coast JJ's - UTC, LLC, Gulf Coast JJ's - ST. Petersburg, LLC, Sunshine Lighthouse Capital, LLC, Henry Weber and Gulf Coast JJ's - ST. Pete III doing business as Jimmy Johns
Case Number: 8:2021cv00863
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 TRANSFER IN from Fort Meyers Division on 04/12/2021 Case Number 2:21-cv-290. Case assigned to District Judge Scriven and Magistrate Judge Wilson. New Case Number: 8:21-cv-863-MSS-TGW. (TDC)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED: The Clerk of the Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida and CLOSE the Fort Myers file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/12/2021. (AEH)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 4 Order,,, filed by U.S. Bank Equipment Finance. (Canter, Ronald)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/9/2021. (RMT)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMT)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Gulf Coast JJ's - Bee Ridge, Gulf Coast JJ's - ST. Pete III, Gulf Coast JJ's - ST. Petersburg, LLC, Gulf Coast JJ's - UTC, LLC, Sunshine Lighthouse Capital, LLC, Henry Weber, Leslie Weber. (RMT)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER Before the Court is a sua sponte review of the file. On April 8, 2021, this case was filed in the Fort Myers Division of the Middle District Florida. The Middle District has five divisions. Local Rule 1.04(a). Best the Court can tell, the injuries occurred in Pinellas and Sarasota Counties, which are part of the Tampa division. And the case caption says "Tampa division." Though two of the named defendants appear to reside in Lee and/or Charlotte County, the Court thinks the Tampa division is the division most directly connected to this action. Local Rule 1.04(b). Thus, Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE on or before April 16, 2021, why this case should not be transferred to the Tampa division. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/9/2021. (TWO)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Gulf Coast JJ's - Bee Ridge, Gulf Coast JJ's - ST. Pete III, Gulf Coast JJ's - ST. Petersburg, LLC, Gulf Coast JJ's - UTC, LLC, Sunshine Lighthouse Capital, LLC, Henry Weber, Leslie Weber. Docketed in error, summons not signed see DOC #5 Modified on 4/9/2021 (RMT).
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0290-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18109282) filed by U.S. BANK EQUIPMENT FINANCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Summons to Bulf Coast JJ's - Bee Ridge, LLC, #10 Proposed Summons to Bulf Coast JJ's - St. Petersburg, LLC, #11 Proposed Summons to Bulf Coast JJ's - UTC, LLC, #12 Proposed Summons to Bulf Coast JJ's - Sunshine Lighthouse Capital, LLC, #13 Proposed Summons to Bulf Coast JJ's - St. Pete III, LLC DBA Jimmy Johns, #14 Proposed Summons Henry Weber, #15 Proposed Summons Leslie Weber)(Canter, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Equipment Finance v. Gulf Coast JJ'S - ST. Pete III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast JJ's - Bee Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast JJ's - UTC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast JJ's - ST. Petersburg, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Lighthouse Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast JJ's - ST. Pete III doing business as Jimmy Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Equipment Finance
Represented By: Ronald S. Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?