Peers v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Dolores Rose Peers
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A. and James E. Albertelli
Case Number: 8:2021cv00935
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wischmeier, Julia)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO QUASH PURPORTED SERVICE OF PROCESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B) AND MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(F) by James E. Albertelli. (Troutman, Shannon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION to Strike Demand for Punitive Damages, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by U.S. Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Final Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Title, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Quash)(Wischmeier, Julia) Modified text on 6/4/2021 (MCB). Added MOTION to Strike on 6/4/2021 (MCB).
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 5/18/2021 by Dolores Rose Peers as to U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. U.S. Bank, N.A. answer or response due on or before 6/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/20/2021. (JMF)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Wischmeier, Julia) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 4/27/2021 by Dolores Rose Peers as to James E. Albertelli. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement (Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03) by U.S. Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Wischmeier, Julia)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by U.S. Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): Yes (Wischmeier, Julia)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia M. Wischmeier on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A. (Wischmeier, Julia)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Bruce Brown on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A. (Brown, Benjamin)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to James E. Albertelli, U.S. Bank, N.A. (CTR)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James E. Albertelli, U.S. Bank, N.A. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 063670 filed by Dolores Rose Peers. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Continued, #2 Exhibit A & B, #3 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peers v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Julia M. Wischmeier
Represented By: Benjamin Bruce Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Albertelli
Represented By: Shannon Leigh Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Rose Peers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?