Yashchenko v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Iryna Yashchenko
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 8:2021cv01044
Filed: May 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Iryna Yashchenko (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Prada, Mark)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Iryna Yashchenko (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Prada, Mark)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Iryna Yashchenko. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 5/21/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Prada, Mark)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 TERMINATED. PROOF of service by Iryna Yashchenko (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Prada, Mark) NOTE: Counsel to file each Proof of Service separately; service to the U.S. Attorney's Office as: Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Modified on 5/21/2021 (LD).
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement as per Local Rule 3.03 by Iryna Yashchenko. (Prada, Mark)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action (none) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Iryna Yashchenko. Related case(s): No (Prada, Mark)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LD)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-1044-MSS-AEP. (SJB)
May 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18203066) filed by Iryna Yashchenko. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Notice of Related Action, #5 Disclosure Statement)(Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yashchenko v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iryna Yashchenko
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?