United States of America v. Tomasello
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jerel A. Tomasello and Jerel A. Tomasello doing business as Liberty Tax Service
Case Number: 8:2021cv01118
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #5 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction by Jerel A. Tomasello. (Harris, Brian)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 the Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Order and Judgment of Permanent Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JRF)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction (consented-to by Defendant) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Permanent Injunction), #2 Exhibit B (Parties' Stipulation))(Edelstein, Russell)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Harris on behalf of Jerel A. Tomasello (Harris, Brian)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-1118-MSS-TGW. (SJB)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerel A. Tomasello filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelstein, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tomasello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerel A. Tomasello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerel A. Tomasello doing business as Liberty Tax Service
Represented By: Brian R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Russell J. Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?