Poulin v. Bush et al
Plaintiff: Matthew C. Poulin
Defendant: Keith Bush, City of North Port, Matthew Lagarce, Stephen Cambria, John Mike Hetteberg, Chad Walker and John Contorno
Case Number: 8:2021cv01516
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn K Mizelle
Referring Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
2 Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 25 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-14 of Plaintiff's Complaint by Keith Bush, Stephen Cambria, John Contorno, John Mike Hetteberg, Matthew Lagarce, Chad Walker. (Kilpatrick, Jamie)
August 18, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Standing Order by Keith Bush, Stephen Cambria, City of North Port, John Contorno, John Mike Hetteberg, Matthew Lagarce, Chad Walker. (Kilpatrick, Jamie)
August 18, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 13, 14, 15, and 16 of Plaintiff's Complaint by City of North Port. (Kilpatrick, Jamie)
August 18, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-14 of Plaintiff's Complaint by Keith Bush, Stephen Cambria, John Contorno, John Mike Hetteberg, Matthew Lagarce, Chad Walker. (Kilpatrick, Jamie)
August 18, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikki C. Day on behalf of Keith Bush, Stephen Cambria, City of North Port, John Contorno, John Mike Hetteberg, Matthew Lagarce, Chad Walker (Day, Nikki)
August 18, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Alexandra Kilpatrick on behalf of Keith Bush, Stephen Cambria, City of North Port, John Contorno, John Mike Hetteberg, Matthew Lagarce, Chad Walker (Kilpatrick, Jamie)
August 5, 2021 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 8/2/21 by Matthew C. Poulin as to Keith Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Keith Bush)(McKenzie, J.)
July 20, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 7/13/2021 by Matthew C. Poulin as to Stephen Cambria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stephen Cambria)(McKenzie, J.)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #16). By August 18, 2021, Defendants must respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/19/2021. (AS)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Kilpatrick, Jamie)
July 14, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 6/28/2021 by Matthew C. Poulin as to City of North Port (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - City of North Port)(McKenzie, J.) Modified event type and notified counsel on 7/15/2021. (JLD)
July 14, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 6/25/2021 by Matthew C. Poulin as to John Contorno (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - John Contorno)(McKenzie, J.) Modified event type and notified counsel on 7/15/2021. (JLD)
July 14, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 6/28/2021 by Matthew C. Poulin as to John Hetteberg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - John Hetteberg)(McKenzie, J.) Modified event type and notified counsel on 7/15/2021. (JLD)
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 7/8/2021 by Matthew C. Poulin as to Matthew Lagarce (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Matthew Lagarce)(McKenzie, J.) Modified event type and notified counsel on 7/15/2021. (JLD)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 7/1/2021 by Matthew C. Poulin as to Chad Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chad Walker)(McKenzie, J.) Modified event type and notified counsel on 7/15/2021. (JLD)
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action Amended per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Matthew C. Poulin. Related case(s): Yes (McKenzie, J.)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 ***Terminated. Counsel needs to refile each Summons Return individually.*** PROOF of service by Matthew C. Poulin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chad Walker, #2 Exhibit B - Matthew Lagarce, #3 Exhibit C - John Hetteberg, #4 Exhibit D - John Contorno, #5 Exhibit E - City of North Port)(McKenzie, J.) Modified text and notified counsel on 7/14/2021. (JLD)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Matthew C. Poulin. (McKenzie, J.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Matthew C. Poulin. Related case(s): No (McKenzie, J.)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. Parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after any defendant appears in this action. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/28/2021. (AS)
June 28, 2021 Remark: USB labeled Exhibits A and B Videos received. Forwarded to Chambers for review. (JLD)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #2). Plaintiff may electronically file Exhibits A and B to the Complaint and deliver the videos to the Court on a USB thumb drive. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/24/2021. (AS)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Keith Bush, Stephen Cambria, City of North Port, John Contorno, John Mike Hetteberg, Matthew Lagarce, and Chad Walker. (JLD)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-1516-KKM-AEP. (SJB)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Permission to File Electronic Media as Exhibit A and B to the Complaint by Matthew C. Poulin. (McKenzie, J.) Modified on 6/23/2021 (JLD).
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18396560) filed by Matthew C. Poulin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Video Pending Motion, #3 Exhibit B - Video Pending Motion, #4 Exhibit C - Photos of Dog Bite, #5 Proposed Summons Bush, #6 Proposed Summons Cambria, #7 Proposed Summons City of North Port, #8 Proposed Summons Contorno, #9 Proposed Summons Hetteberg, #10 Proposed Summons Lagarce, #11 Proposed Summons Walker)(McKenzie, J.) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poulin v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bush
Represented By: Nikki C. Day
Represented By: Jamie Alexandra Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Port
Represented By: Nikki C. Day
Represented By: Jamie Alexandra Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lagarce
Represented By: Nikki C. Day
Represented By: Jamie Alexandra Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Cambria
Represented By: Nikki C. Day
Represented By: Jamie Alexandra Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mike Hetteberg
Represented By: Nikki C. Day
Represented By: Jamie Alexandra Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Walker
Represented By: Nikki C. Day
Represented By: Jamie Alexandra Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Contorno
Represented By: Nikki C. Day
Represented By: Jamie Alexandra Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew C. Poulin
Represented By: J. Alistair McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?