Allen v. Jurick, et al
Plaintiff: Kent Allen, Jr.
Defendant: Lynn Jurick and Keyshia Cole
Case Number: 8:2021cv01688
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
2 Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and dismissing #1 Complaint as frivolous. The Clerk is directed terminate all pending motions and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/27/2021. (NPC)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle. New case number: 8:21-cv-1688-KKM-TGW. Judge William F. Jung no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to Judge Mizelle, with her knowledge and consent, and directing Clerk to complete transfer. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/26/2021. (CCB)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Kent Allen, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keyshia Cole(Individually), Keyshia Cole(official capacity as recording artist for WMG under BMG US Management), Lynn Jurick filed by Kent Allen, Jr.(AG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Jurick, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Jurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyshia Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?