V.W. et al v. Lohstreter et al
Plaintiff: V.W. and D.W.
Defendant: Thomas A. Lohstreter and MCR Health, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv01775
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/7/2021. (APF)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MCR Health, Inc.. (Dilday, Amy)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by MCR Health, Inc. re #6 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS AND TO SUBSTITUTE THE UNITED STATES AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by MCR Health, Inc. (Dilday, Amy)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendant MCR Health, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing the Case Management Report. The deadline for the Parties to file a case management report is extended until twenty (20) days after the resolution of Defendant, MCR Health, Inc's Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Substitute the United States, (Dkt. 6), and/or Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Dkt. 10), if any portion of the matter remains in federal court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/30/2021. (APF)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by MCR Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dilday, Amy) Modified on 8/27/2021 (TDC).
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by D.W., V.W. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Losito Complaint, #2 Exhibit Losito Docket)(Perez, Alan) Modified on 8/23/2021 (TDC).
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #6 Motion to Stay filed by D.W., V.W.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Losito Complaint, #2 Exhibit Losito Docket)(Perez, Alan)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Smayda on behalf of Thomas A. Lohstreter. (Smayda, Todd) Modified on 8/9/2021 (TDC).
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for oral argument by MCR Health, Inc. (Dilday, Amy) Modified on 8/5/2021 (TDC).
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and to Substitute the United States and Supporting Memorandum of Law by MCR Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Dilday, Amy) Modified on 8/5/2021 (TDC).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-1775-MSS-TGW. (SJB)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by MCR Health, Inc. (Dilday, Amy) Modified on 7/22/2021 (TDC).
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 12th Judicial Circuit in and for Sarasota County, FL, case number 2021-CA-002048 filed in State Court on 4/29/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18505810 filed by MCR Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court ANSWER, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dilday, Amy) Modified on 7/22/2021 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V.W. et al v. Lohstreter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.W.
Represented By: Alan L. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.W.
Represented By: Alan L. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Lohstreter
Represented By: Todd Michael Smayda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCR Health, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. Dilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?