Badawi v. Brunswick Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sam Badawi
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats, Inc. and MarineMax East, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv01825
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Joint Motion to Extend the Stay Pending Resolution Negotiations" (Doc. #10) is granted. This action is stayed until September 30, 2021. All pending deadlines are extended to and including October 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/20/2021. (EKB)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS report by Brunswick Corporation, MarineMax East, Inc., Sea Ray Boats, Inc.. (Aiello, Julie)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Extend the Stay and pending deadlines by MarineMax East, Inc. (Aiello, Julie)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Joint Motion to Abate or Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution Negotiations" (Doc. #8) is granted. This action and all deadlines are stayed for 30 days from the date of this Order. If the case is not resolved during the stay, the parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before September 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/16/2021. (EKB)
August 15, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay by MarineMax East, Inc. (Aiello, Julie) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (AG).
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mandi B. Clay on behalf of Sam Badawi (Clay, Mandi)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats, Inc. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Notice of Filing Supplement to Motion to Dismiss (Paul, Christina)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant MarineMax East, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint" (Doc. #4) is granted. MarineMax East, Inc., may file its response to the complaint on or before August 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/6/2021. (EKB)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by MarineMax East, Inc.. (Aiello, Julie)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats, Inc.. (Paul, Christina)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-1825-TPB-AAS. (SJB)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit for Hillsborough County, case number 21-CA-5397 DIV H filed in State Court on 6/29/21. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18533692 filed by Brunswick Corporation, Sea Ray Boats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Paul, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Badawi v. Brunswick Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Badawi
Represented By: Mandi B. Clay
Represented By: Sam Youssef Badawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Represented By: Christina McGinley Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Ray Boats, Inc.
Represented By: Christina McGinley Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MarineMax East, Inc.
Represented By: Julie A. Aiello
Represented By: Michael Joseph Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?