Hernandez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jose Gregorio Hernandez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2021cv01856
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Hernandez's #3 motion to expand the record. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/31/2021. (JT)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave of Court to Expand the Record Pursuant to Rule 7 of the Rules Governing Habeas Corpus by Jose Gregorio Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Mailing Envelope)(ABC)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the United States to respond to Hernandez's #1 motion to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence. The United States must respond within 60 DAYS. Hernandez may reply within 28 DAYS. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send to the United States a copy of the #1 motion. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/13/2021. (JDT)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:19-cr-00396-MSS-AAS filed by Jose Gregorio Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(TDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gregorio Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph K. Ruddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?