GEICO Marine Insurance Company v. Seaside Mobile Marine, LLC
Plaintiff: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Seaside Mobile Marine, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv01972
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Seaside Mobile Marine, LLC (MCB)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Seaside Mobile Marine, LLC by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Default Order)(Borak, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF of service by GEICO Marine Insurance Company (Borak, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Seaside Mobile Marine, LLC. (MCB)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by GEICO Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway for GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Borak, Robert)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-1972-CEH-TGW. (SJB)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seaside Mobile Marine, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18598301) filed by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Borak, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEICO Marine Insurance Company v. Seaside Mobile Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Mark Borak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaside Mobile Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?