Molina Pico v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Alberto Bienvenido Molina Pico
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2021cv02014
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of inquiry by Alberto Bienvenido Molina Pico (copy of docket sheet mailed) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Waiver of Fees by Alberto Bienvenido Molina Pico. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER striking Motions to Vacate (#1 and #3). No later than 10/18/2021, Molina must submit a properly signed amended motion to vacate on the required form. The Clerk is directed to return a copy of the motions to Melina with a blank form for moving under Section 2255 to vacate. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/23/2021. (SRC)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DKT. 4 ORDER*** SUPPLEMENT re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) by Alberto Bienvenido Molina Pico. (JNB) Modified on 9/27/2021 (LD).
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of substitution of AUSA. Erin Claire Favorit substituting for Walter E. Furr. (Favorit, Erin)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION (not signed) to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:16-cr-63-TPB-JSS filed by Alberto Bienvenido Molina Pico. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP) Modified on 8/24/2021 (TNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina Pico v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Bienvenido Molina Pico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Erin Claire Favorit
Represented By: Walter E. Furr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?