Arias v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Yannier Arias
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2021cv02017
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Yannier Arias. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/27/2021. (LSS)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER dismissing as untimely #1 the Motion to Vacate / Set Aside / Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Petitioner Yannier Arias; directing the Clerk to enter judgment against Petitioner in this civil case and to close the case; and declining to grant a certificate of appealability or to grant in forma pauperis status to Petitioner for an appeal of this order. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 8/26/2021. (DMB)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:15-cr-00328-SCB-AAS filed by Yannier Arias. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arias v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yannier Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Eric Gerard
Represented By: Jillian M. Jewell
Represented By: Kelley Clement Howard-Allen
Represented By: Suzanne C. Nebesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?