United States of America v. Assets Identified in Paragraph 1 of the Verified Complaint
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Assets Identified in Paragraph 1 of the Verified Complaint
Case Number: 8:2021cv02283
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: Official Government Internet Site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication 30 consecutive days from October 15, 2021 through November 13, 2021. (Muench, James)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 US Marshal 285 form for Execution of Warrant of Arrest re executed 10/18/2021 as to $57,813.91. (MCB)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 US Marshal 285 form for Execution of Warrant of Arrest re executed 10/18/2021 as to $6,453.41. (MCB)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement (Amended) by United States of America. (Muench, James)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against Assets Identified in Paragraph 1 of the Verified Complaint filed by United States of America.(Muench, James)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant In Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on September 29, 2021. (AKA)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States of America. (Muench, James)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by United States of America. Related case(s): Yes (Muench, James)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by United States of America. (Muench, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-2283-VMC-JSS. (SJB)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against Assets Identified in Paragraph 1 of the Verified Complaint filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muench, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Assets Identified in Paragraph 1 of the Verified Complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James A. Muench
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assets Identified in Paragraph 1 of the Verified Complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?