Access Health Care Physicians, LLC v. IT Possible, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Access Health Care Physicians, LLC
Defendant: IT POSSIBLE, LLC and Kirit S. Desai
Case Number: 8:2021cv02306
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's complaint MOTION to Stay filed by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. (Norman, Todd)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER: "Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Stay or Dismiss" (Doc. #28) is granted. Plaintiff may file its response to Defendants' motion to stay or dismiss the complaint on or before November 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/22/2021. (EKB)
November 22, 2021 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's complaint MOTION to Stay by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. (Norman, Todd)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 3/7/2022; Discovery due by 12/2/2022; Dispositive motions due by 1/30/2023; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/3/2022; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/3/2022; Rebuttal disclosure of expert report due by 10/31/2022; Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Trial set for August 2023 trial term (commencing 7/31/2023) before Judge Thomas P. Barber. The parties anticipate a JURY TRIAL will take 5 days to complete. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/15/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/19/2021. (SRC)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER: "Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Stay or Dismiss Within 21 Days" (Doc. #25) is granted. Plaintiff may file its response to Defendants' motion to stay or dismiss the complaint on or before November 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/4/2021. (EKB)
November 4, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay or Dismiss within 21 Days by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. (Norman, Todd)
November 1, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's complaint; and/or MOTION to stay with incorporated memorandum of law by Kirit S. Desai, IT Possible, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint incorporating the Amendment to Count IV.pdf, #2 Exhibit B - September 22 2021 Order Granting NOE Etc.pdf, #3 Exhibit C - Singh Motion to Stay in Circuit Court.pdf, #4 Exhibit D - 2019-10-29 - Fwd CHO Domain Name_Redacted.pdf, #5 Exhibit E - 2021-03-17 - Fw External Re Fax to email outage at 5000 park street_Redacted.pdf, #6 Exhibit F - 2021-08-18 - Fw Comphemeonc website down_Redacted.pdf, #7 Exhibit G - 2021-08-18 - Fw Comphemeonc website down.pdf, #8 Exhibit H - 2021-09-05-07 - RE Access Healthcare Physicians GoDaddy Account.pdf, #9 Exhibit I - 2021-09-10 - Domain Access.pdf, #10 Exhibit J - 2021-09-12 - Fwd External Contact Info.pdf, #11 Exhibit K - 2021-09-13 - RE External Contact Info.pdf, #12 Exhibit L - 2021-09-13 - Re External Fwd Domain Access.pdf, #13 Exhibit M - 2021-09-16 - Re External Domain Access CHO.pdf, #14 Exhibit N - 2021-10-05 - Access Healthcare Physicians v IT Possible and Desai Case.pdf)(Dixit, Shyam) . Added MOTION to Stay on 11/8/2021 (AG).
November 1, 2021 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Norman, Todd)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint" (Doc. #21) is granted. Defendants may file their response to the complaint on or before November 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/21/2021. (EKB)
October 20, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Kirit S. Desai, IT Possible, LLC. (Dixit, Shyam)
October 8, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kirit S. Desai, IT Possible, LLC. (Dixit, Shyam)
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kirit S. Desai, IT Possible, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Cohen, Victor)
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. Related case(s): No (Norman, Todd)
October 8, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. (Norman, Todd)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE canceling Evidentiary hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021. (SRC)
October 6, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Barber: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/6/2021. Court Reporter: Rebekah Lockwood (SRC)
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Shyam N.S. Dixit, Jr on behalf of Kirit S. Desai, IT Possible, LLC. Lead Counsel: Shyam(ie) NS Dixit. (Dixit, Shyam)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Todd K. Norman on behalf of Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. Lead Counsel: Todd K. Norman. (Norman, Todd)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Stephen Cohen on behalf of Kirit S. Desai, IT Possible, LLC (Cohen, Victor)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shyam N.S. Dixit, Jr on behalf of Kirit S. Desai, IT Possible, LLC (Dixit, Shyam)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of hearing: Status Conference set for OCTOBER 6, 2021 at 03:00 PM by Zoom Video Conference before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Participants will receive a Zoom invitation by separate email. (SRC)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: "Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law" (Doc. #2) is denied in part and deferred in part. The motion is denied to the extent that it seeks an ex parte temporary restraining order, without notice to Defendants or an opportunity for Defendants to be heard. The Court will defer ruling on the motion to the extent that it seeks a preliminary injunction until such time as Defendants may be heard in opposition. Plaintiff is directed to serve Defendants as soon as possible with the items required by Local Rule 6.01(c), including the summons and complaint, Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, and a copy of this Order. The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's motion on October 12, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14A. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/1/2021. (EKB)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Kirit S. Desai, IT Possible, LLC. (LD)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. (Norman, Todd)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. (Norman, Todd)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2306-TPB-AAS. (SJB)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Norman, Todd)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Injuctive Relief Requested against Kirit S. Desai, IT POSSIBLE, LLC filed by Access Health Care Physicians, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Norman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Access Health Care Physicians, LLC v. IT Possible, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Access Health Care Physicians, LLC
Represented By: Todd K. Norman
Represented By: Olivia Rose Share
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IT POSSIBLE, LLC
Represented By: Shyam N.S. Dixit, Jr
Represented By: Victor Stephen Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirit S. Desai
Represented By: Shyam N.S. Dixit, Jr
Represented By: Victor Stephen Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?