Citrosuco North America, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Citrosuco North America, Inc.
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv02359
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Citrosuco North America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Citrosuco North America, Inc., Other Affiliate R. Hugh Lumpkin, Other Affiliate Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP, Other Affiliate Hudson Jones, Other Affiliate Citrosuco Europe N.V., Other Affiliate Reed Smith LLP, Other Affiliate Edward M. Mullins, Other Affiliate Garrett S. Nemeroff, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. for Citrosuco North America, Inc. (Nemeroff, Garrett) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (JLD).
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Citrosuco North America, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Nemeroff, Garrett) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (JLD).
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 10/15/2021 by Citrosuco North America, Inc. as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Lumpkin, Richard) Corrected event type and notified counsel on 10/20/2021. (JLD)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Richard Hugh Lumpkin on behalf of Citrosuco North America, Inc. Lead Counsel: Richard Hugh Lumpkin. (Lumpkin, Richard) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (JLD).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after any defendant appears for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/8/2021. (JMB)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (JLD)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel to Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2359-KKM-AEP. (SJB)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18788478) filed by Citrosuco North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Policy)(Lumpkin, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citrosuco North America, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citrosuco North America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hugh Lumpkin
Represented By: Garrett Nemeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?