Mullen et al v. Syniverse Corporation
Plaintiff: alexis mullen, nicholas yeomelakis and thomas macnish
Defendant: Syniverse Corporation
Case Number: 8:2021cv02363
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Cases associated: Create association to 8:21-cv-02349-SCB-SPF. (LSS)
November 29, 2021 Remark: All further pleadings be filed in Lead Case No. 8:21-cv-2349-SCB-SPF. (LSS)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER consolidating this case with Case No. 8:21-cv-2349-SCB-SPF; directing that all further pleadings be filed in Lead Case No. 8:21-cv-2349-SCB-SPF; and directing the Clerk to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 11/24/2021. (SLB)
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Melissa Baron of filing motion to consolidate this action with previously-filed action also before this Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Yanchunis, John)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 11/2/2021. (SLB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Syniverse Corporation. (Kramer, Jessica)
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Palermo on behalf of Syniverse Corporation (Palermo, Anthony)
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason H. Baruch on behalf of Syniverse Corporation (Baruch, Jason)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-2363-SCB-SPF. Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (CAB)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to assign Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn to this action pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(a)(2). Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 10/21/2021. (SLB)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Special Admission of a Non-Resident Lawyer, as to Linda P. Nussbaum. No later than November 4, 2021, counsel shall complete the e-filer registration (information available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 10/21/2021. (CTB)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Susan C. Bucklew. New case number: 8:21-cv-2363-SCB-CPT. Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED: Pursuant to M.D. Fla. Local Rule 1.07(a)(2), the Clerk is hereby directed to TRANSFER this action to United States District Judge Susan C. Bucklew, with her consent, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/20/2021. (JDE)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Linda P. Nussbaum to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18792939 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oath)(Love, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Thomas Macnish, Alexis Mullen, Nicholas Yeomelakis. Related case(s): Yes (Love, Kevin)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Syniverse Corporation. (MCB)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:21-cv-2363-CEH-CPT. (SJB)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Syniverse Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18789776) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Love, Kevin) Modified text on 10/7/2021 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullen et al v. Syniverse Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: alexis mullen
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Michael E. Criden
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: nicholas yeomelakis
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Michael E. Criden
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: thomas macnish
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Michael E. Criden
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syniverse Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J. Palermo
Represented By: Jason H. Baruch
Represented By: Jessica Sarah Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?