Cornu et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Nolan C Cornu, Anh D Cornu, Nolan C. Cornu and Anh D. Cornu
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Director Ur M. Jaddou, Acting FOD Michael McCleary, Acting FOD Joanne Sassone, USCIS, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Michael McCleary, Joanne Sassone and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 8:2021cv02407
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Anh D. Cornu, Nolan C. Cornu. (Gihon, John)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to file a status report on their efforts to perfect service of process on all Defendants by December 13, 2021. Additionally, the Court notes that, pursuant to (Doc. #10), service on Defendant Michael McCleary was sent by certified mail to the Tampa USCIS Field office, despite Defendant Michael McCleary being titled as the acting director of the Orlando USCIS Field office in the Complaint. Plaintiffs are also directed to file a status report to clarify the discrepancy by December 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/2/2021. (CTL)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS report by Anh D. Cornu, Nolan C. Cornu. (Gihon, John)
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Anh D. Cornu, Nolan C. Cornu. (Gihon, John)
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Anh D. Cornu, Nolan C. Cornu. (Gihon, John)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: In this case, Plaintiffs have sued four government officers or employees sued in their official capacities and the United States Citizenship and Immigration Service, a federal agency. (Doc. # 1 at 3-7). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2), "to serve a United States agency or corporation, or a United States officer or employee sued only in an official capacity, a party must serve the United States and also send a copy of the summons and of the complaint by registered or certified mail to the agency, corporation, officer, or employee." Plaintiffs are directed to file a status report with respect to their efforts to serve the Defendants in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 by December 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/19/2021. (SGM)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Nolan C. Cornu, Anh D. Cornu. US Attorney served on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (LNR)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Anh D. Cornu, Nolan C. Cornu. (Gihon, John)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Michael McCleary, Joanne Sassone, USCIS. (LNR)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Anh D. Cornu, Nolan C. Cornu. Related case(s): No. (Gihon, John) Modified text on 10/15/2021 (LNR).
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Anh D Cornu, Nolan C Cornu. (Gihon, John)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-2407-VMC-JSS. (SJB)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18811732) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gihon, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornu et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan C Cornu
Represented By: John Gihon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anh D Cornu
Represented By: John Gihon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan C. Cornu
Represented By: John Gihon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anh D. Cornu
Represented By: John Gihon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting FOD Michael McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting FOD Joanne Sassone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Sassone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?