State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Larocca et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Michael Larocca, Blake Larocca, Michael Major, Jason Edward Hunt, Jeffrey Eduard Raheb, Antoinetter Denise Stewart, Ruth Germaine Griffin, Savannah Jane Mayberry, Mournir Semia, Tobias Bacaner, Cecilio Torres-Ruiz, Lori Rebein, All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC, Larocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC, Larocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC, Larocca Injury Centers, LLC, Larocca Auto Injury Center, LLC, Michael Thomas LaRocca, Blake Thomas LaRocca and Michael August Major
Case Number: 8:2021cv02536
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Patrick Hanes on behalf of Tobias Bacaner (Hanes, Ronald)
December 14, 2021 Filing 45 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC, Ruth Germaine Griffin, Jason Edward Hunt, Blake Thomas LaRocca, Michael Thomas LaRocca, LaRocca Auto Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Injury Centers, LLC, Michael August Major, Savannah Jane Mayberry, Lori Rebein, Antoinetter Denise Stewart, Cecilio Torres-Ruiz. (Causey, Patrick)
December 1, 2021 Filing 44 RETURN of service executed on November 19, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Savannah Jane Mayberry. (Baroff, Aaron)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 the Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint by Defendant Savannah Jane Mayberry. Defendant shall file her response on or before 1/10/22. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 12/1/2021. (DMB)
December 1, 2021 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Savannah Jane Mayberry. (Causey, Patrick)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED ENDORSED ORDER granting #39 the Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Tobias Bacaner shall file his response to the Complaint on or before before January 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 11/29/2021. (DMB)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER granting #39 the Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Tobias Bacaner shall file his response to the Complaint on or before before December 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 11/29/2021. (DMB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Tobias Bacaner. (Luka, Philip)
November 29, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Matthew Luka on behalf of Tobias Bacaner (Luka, Philip)
November 22, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret R Knaust on behalf of All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC, Ruth Germaine Griffin, Jason Edward Hunt, Blake Thomas LaRocca, Michael Thomas LaRocca, LaRocca Auto Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Injury Centers, LLC, Michael August Major, Lori Rebein, Antoinetter Denise Stewart, Cecilio Torres-Ruiz (Knaust, Margaret)
November 22, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Goldsmith on behalf of All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC, Ruth Germaine Griffin, Jason Edward Hunt, Blake Thomas LaRocca, Michael Thomas LaRocca, LaRocca Auto Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Injury Centers, LLC, Michael August Major, Lori Rebein, Antoinetter Denise Stewart, Cecilio Torres-Ruiz (Goldsmith, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Causey on behalf of All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC, Ruth Germaine Griffin, Jason Edward Hunt, Blake Thomas LaRocca, Michael Thomas LaRocca, LaRocca Auto Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Injury Centers, LLC, Michael August Major, Lori Rebein, Antoinetter Denise Stewart, Cecilio Torres-Ruiz (Causey, Patrick)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC, answer or response due 1/10/2022; Blake Thomas LaRocca answer or response due 1/10/2022; LaRocca Auto Injury Center, LLC, answer or response due 1/10/2022; LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC, answer or response due 1/10/2022; LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC, answer or response due 1/10/2022; LaRocca Injury Centers, LLC, answer or response due 1/10/2022. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 11/22/2021. (SLB)
November 22, 2021 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC, Blake Thomas LaRocca, LaRocca Auto Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Injury Centers, LLC. (Causey, Patrick)
November 18, 2021 Filing 32 RETURN of service executed on November 8, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 18, 2021 Filing 31 RETURN of service executed on November 8, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to LaRocca Injury Centers, LLC. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 17, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER of service returned executed on November 17, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Lori Rebein. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 17, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER of service returned executed on November 17, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Cecilio Torres-Ruiz. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 17, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER of service returned executed on November 17, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Antoinetter Denise Stewart. (Baroff, Aaron) Corrected type of service on 11/18/2021 (LSS).
November 17, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER of service returned executed on November 17, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Michael Thomas LaRocca. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 17, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER of service returned executed on November 17, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Michael August Major. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 17, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER of service returned executed on November 17, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Jason Edward Hunt. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 17, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER of service returned executed on November 17, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Ruth Germaine Griffin. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 17, 2021 Filing 23 RETURN of service executed on November 10, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Tobias Bacaner. (Baroff, Aaron) Modified date of service on 11/18/2021 (LSS).
November 17, 2021 Filing 22 RETURN of service executed on November 8, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC. (Baroff, Aaron) Modified date of service on 11/18/2021 (LSS).
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on November 8, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to LaRocca Auto Injury Center, LLC. (Baroff, Aaron) Modified date of service on 11/18/2021 (LSS).
November 17, 2021 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on November 8, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Blake Thomas LaRocca. (Baroff, Aaron) Modified date of service on 11/18/2021 (LSS).
November 17, 2021 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on November 8, 2021 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC. (Baroff, Aaron) Modified date of service on 11/18/2021 (LSS).
November 16, 2021 Filing 18 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Baroff, Aaron) Modified on 11/17/2021 (LSS).
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Baroff, Aaron) Modified on 11/17/2021 (LSS).
November 16, 2021 Filing 16 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Baroff, Aaron) Modified on 11/17/2021 (LSS).
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Baroff, Aaron) Modified on 11/17/2021 (LSS).
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Baroff, Aaron) Modified on 11/17/2021 (LSS).
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of compliance of Plaintiffs' Attorneys Ross O. Silverman, Eric T. Gortner, and Michael J. Powers by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Baroff, Aaron)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Aaron H. Baroff on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Bart R. Valdes. (Baroff, Aaron)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (CAB)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel Aaron H. Baroff, Bart R. Valdes of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC, Tobias Bacaner, Ruth Germaine Griffin, Jason Edward Hunt, Blake Thomas LaRocca, Michael Thomas LaRocca, LaRocca Auto Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC, LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC, LaRocca Injury Centers, LLC, Michael August Major, Savannah Jane Mayberry, Jeffrey Eduard Raheb, Lori Rebein, Mournir Semia, Antoinetter Denise Stewart, Cecilio Torres-Ruiz. (LSS)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Ross O. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Eric T. Gortner to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for Michael J. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Silverman, Gortner, and Powers are directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in their CM/ECF accounts, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by 11/30/2021. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to them after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 10/29/2021. (SLB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2536-SCB-AEP. (SJB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Michael J. Powers to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18874180 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Valdes, Bart)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Eric T. Gortner to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18874165 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Valdes, Bart)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Ross O. Silverman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18874142 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Valdes, Bart)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Valdes, Bart)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Valdes, Bart)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18873573) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #47 Proposed Summons Summons for Michael LaRocca, #48 Proposed Summons Summons for Blake LaRocca, #49 Proposed Summons Summons for Michael Major, #50 Proposed Summons Summons for Jason Hunt, #51 Proposed Summons Summons for Jeffrey Raheb, #52 Proposed Summons Summons for Antoinette Stewart, #53 Proposed Summons Summons Savannah Mayberry, #54 Proposed Summons Summons for Mounir Semia, #55 Proposed Summons Summons for Ruth Griffin, #56 Proposed Summons Summons to Tobias Bacaner, #57 Proposed Summons Summons to Cecilio Torres-Ruiz, #58 Proposed Summons Summons to Lori Rebein, #59 Proposed Summons Summons for All Accidents, #60 Proposed Summons Summons for LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, #61 Proposed Summons Summons to LaRocca Chiropractic Injury Center, #62 Proposed Summons Summons to LaRocca Injury Center, #63 Proposed Summons Summons to LaRocca Auto Injury Center)(Valdes, Bart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al v. Larocca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Bart R. Valdes
Represented By: Aaron H. Baroff
Represented By: Eric T. Gortner
Represented By: Michael J. Powers
Represented By: Ross O. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Bart R. Valdes
Represented By: Aaron H. Baroff
Represented By: Eric T. Gortner
Represented By: Michael J. Powers
Represented By: Ross O. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Larocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Larocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Edward Hunt
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Eduard Raheb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinetter Denise Stewart
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Germaine Griffin
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah Jane Mayberry
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mournir Semia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobias Bacaner
Represented By: Philip Matthew Luka
Represented By: Ronald Patrick Hanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilio Torres-Ruiz
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Rebein
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Accidents Chiropractic Center, PLLC
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larocca Chiropractic Injury Center, LLC
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larocca Injury Centers, LLC
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larocca Auto Injury Center, LLC
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Thomas LaRocca
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Thomas LaRocca
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael August Major
Represented By: Patrick M. Causey
Represented By: John D. Goldsmith
Represented By: Margaret R Knaust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?