Bauer et al v. Chronister
Plaintiff: Douglas Bauer and Haleigh Bauer
Defendant: Chad Chronister
Case Number: 8:2021cv02698
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Douglas Bauer, Haleigh Bauer. (Redavid, Jordan)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must respond no later than January 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/21/2021. (SMR)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Redavid, Jordan) Modified text on 12/21/2021 (JLD).
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chad Chronister. Related case(s): No (Brown, Christopher)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Chad Chronister. (Brown, Christopher)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Chad Chronister. (Brown, Christopher)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Douglas Bauer, Haleigh Bauer. (Redavid, Jordan)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Douglas Bauer, Haleigh Bauer. Related case(s): No (Redavid, Jordan)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet and file a Case Management Report within forty days of any defendant appearing in this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/22/2021. (SMR)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Chad Chronister. (BD)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2698-KKM-AEP. (LMW)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chad Chronister, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18935593) filed by Douglas Bauer, Haleigh Bauer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant Chad Chronister)(Redavid, Jordan) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer et al v. Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Bauer
Represented By: Jordan Redavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haleigh Bauer
Represented By: Jordan Redavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Chronister
Represented By: Christopher Erik Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?