Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Loknath Food and Fuel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Defendant: Loknath Food and Fuel, LLC and Michael Russo
Case Number: 8:2021cv02721
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Sarah Russo on behalf of Michael Russo. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 12/15/2021 by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company as to Loknath Food and Fuel, LLC. (Bueno, Sergio)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sergio Bueno on behalf of Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Sina Bahadoran. (Bueno, Sergio)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Loknath Food and Fuel, LLC, Michael Russo. (BD)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsels Sergio Bueno and Sina Bahadoran of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2721-MSS-AAS. (MLJ)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LOKNATH FOOD AND FUEL, LLC, Michael Russo (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18948584) filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit B -VERDICT, #4 Exhibit C - POLICY, #5 Proposed Summons LOKNATH FOOD AND FUEL, LLC, #6 Proposed Summons MICHAEL RUSSO)(Bueno, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. Loknath Food and Fuel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Sergio Bueno
Represented By: Sina Bahadoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loknath Food and Fuel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?