Phillips et al v. National Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Timothy Phillips and Diane Phillips
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv02726
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 Disclosure Statement by National Specialty Insurance Company (Floyd, Isaiah)
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by National Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Floyd, Isaiah)
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Isaiah Kaneen Floyd on behalf of National Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Brian P. Henry. (Floyd, Isaiah)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Diane Phillips, Timothy Phillips. (Karasik, Seth)
December 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Diane Phillips, Timothy Phillips. Related case(s): Yes (Karasik, Seth)
December 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Seth Karasik on behalf of Diane Phillips, Timothy Phillips. Lead Counsel: Seth M. Karasik. (Karasik, Seth)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN; DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 26.***CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Diane Phillips, Timothy Phillips. (Karasik, Seth) Modified text and image on 12/28/2021 (LNR). (LNR).
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Floyd, Isaiah)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Isaiah Kaneen Floyd on behalf of National Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Brian P. Henry. (Floyd, Isaiah)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
November 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsels Isaiah K. Floyd and Brian P. Henry of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
November 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
November 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-2726-WFJ-TGW. (LMW)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sarasota Circuit Court, case number 2021-CA-002558 NC filed in State Court on 05/26/21. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18949361 filed by National Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Def Fed Diversity Requests, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Ps Responses to RFA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Ds RFA, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Ps Responses to 1st RFA, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F Corp Rep Affidavit, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G Proof of Loss, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H Index of Record, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I State NOR, #10 State Court ANSWER State Court Answer, #11 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #12 State Court Other Documents State Court Other Documents, #13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Floyd, Isaiah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips et al v. National Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Phillips
Represented By: Paris Richard Webb
Represented By: Seth Karasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Phillips
Represented By: Paris Richard Webb
Represented By: Seth Karasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Isaiah Kaneen Floyd
Represented By: Brian P. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?