Grogan et al v. Truist Bank
Plaintiff: Mark Grogan and Lisa Grogan
Defendant: Truist Bank
Case Number: 8:2021cv02732
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: "Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint" (Doc. #13) is granted. Plaintiffs may file their response on or before February 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 1/7/2022. (EKB)
January 5, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Lisa Grogan, Mark Grogan. (Adams, David)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for oral argument re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Truist Bank. (Barton, Ana)
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Barton, Ana)
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Truist Bank with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Adams, David)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lisa Grogan, Mark Grogan. (Adams, David)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 7 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate SunTrust Bank Holding Company, Other Affiliate BB&T Corporation, Other Affiliate SunTrust Bank for Truist Bank. (Barton, Ana)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant Truist Bank's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint" (Doc. #5) is granted. Defendant may file its response to the complaint, or amended complaint if one is filed, on or before December 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/23/2021. (EKB)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal /State Court Complaint by Truist Bank. (Barton, Ana)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsels David W. Adams and Joseph C. Jones of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Joseph C. Jones of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). ***CLERK ENTERED IN ERROR. Counsel is registered to practice in MDFL. (BD) Modified on 1/7/2022 to edit text (BD).
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2732-TPB-AAS. (SJB)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit Court, Pinellas County, FL, case number 21-004869 filed in State Court on October 12, 2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18950999 filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Ex. A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Ex. B, #4 Ex C - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barton, Ana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grogan et al v. Truist Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Grogan
Represented By: David W. Adams
Represented By: Joseph Carl Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Grogan
Represented By: David W. Adams
Represented By: Joseph Carl Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Represented By: Ana Maria Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?