Price v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Price
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. and Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Case Number: 8:2021cv02788
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 21 Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.).(Albert, Jessica)
January 14, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Glenn Price. (Doyle, James)
January 13, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.).(Kolaya, Timothy)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Kerry J. Miller, Daniel J. Dysart, Rebekka C. Veith, and Michael R. Dodson may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 1/12/2022. (SFC)
January 11, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Michael R. Dodson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19110975 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 11, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Rebekka C. Veith to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19110969 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 11, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel J. Dysart to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19110966 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 11, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Kerry J. Miller to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19110955 for $150 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). (Kolaya, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) identifying Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Isogranulat GmbH, Corporate Parent Knauf Singarporte Pte Ltd., Corporate Parent Knauf International GmbH for Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.); Corporate Parent Gebr. Knauf KG, Corporate Parent Isogranulat GmbH for Knauf Gips KG. (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.). Lead Counsel: Kerry J. Miller. (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) (Kolaya, Timothy)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12/23/21 by Glenn Price as to Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. (Doyle, James)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 12/23/21 by Glenn Price as to Knauf Gips KG. (Doyle, James)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for an order allowing service of process on Defendants' United States counsel by electronic means. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/22/2021. (BEE)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Glenn Price. Related case(s): Yes (Doyle, James)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Alternative Service by Glenn Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Ruling by Judge Ruiz, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit of Celeste Ingalls, #3 Exhibit C: IMA Article, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Doyle, James) Modified event and text on 12/10/2021 (MCB).
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. (MCB)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2788-CEH-AAS. (SJB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand filed by Glenn Price. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Knauf Gips KG, #3 Proposed Summons Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.u)(Doyle, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Price
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Jessica P Albert
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Jessica P Albert
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?