Abbott v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Mark Abbott
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 8:2021cv02820
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set on the February 2023 Trial Term. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/12/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/20/2022. (CRB) Modified on 1/20/2022 to reflect correct year of trial term (CRB).
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Lehner, Steven)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent The New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Lehner, Steven)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including January 24, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/4/2022. (JRF)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Lehner, Steven)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 12/14/2021 by Mark Abbott as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Swartwood, Gregory)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (BD)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mark Abbott. (Swartwood, Gregory)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Mark Abbott. Related case(s): No (Swartwood, Gregory)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:21-cv-2820-MSS-SPF. (SJB)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18992119) filed by Mark Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - venue, #2 Exhibit B - policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Swartwood, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Abbott
Represented By: Gregory D. Swartwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Steven D. Lehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?