Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bryan J. Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2021cv02906
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer until March 16, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/11/2022. (SFC)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until March 16, 2022 by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bryan J. Smith. Related case(s): Yes (Avard, Carol)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/17/2021. (SFC)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (BD)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2906-TPB-AAS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. (SJB)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Bryan J. Smith. (Avard, Carol)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Bryan J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan J. Smith
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?