Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Quality T-Tops & Boat Accessories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: QUALITY T-TOPS & BOAT ACCESSORIES, INC., ANGELA MARIE MEISMAN, AMBER MICHELLE MOONEY, SEAN P. DONAHUE, CHRISTOPHER C. FRENCH, COLIN J. KEELER, CONSTANCE LEWIS, VAUGHN W. MONGAN and AUSTIN LEWIS
Case Number: 8:2021cv02959
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS and MEMORANDUM OF LAW ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Angela Marie Meisman, Quality T-Tops & Boat Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Abbey, David)
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 JOINDER in motion by Amber Michelle Mooney re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Quality T-Tops & Boat Accessories, Inc., Angela Marie Meisman . (Boyle, Michael)
February 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David J. Abbey on behalf of Angela Marie Meisman, Quality T-Tops & Boat Accessories, Inc.. Lead Counsel: David J. Abbey and Thomas W. Cope. (Abbey, David)
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Angela Marie Meisman, Quality T-Tops & Boat Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Abbey, David)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael J. Boyle on behalf of Amber Michelle Mooney. Lead Counsel: LeavenLaw. (Boyle, Michael)
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or Alternatively, Joint Motion To Abstain by Sean P. Donahue, Christopher C. French. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Twombly, Robert)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (CAB)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robin Petronella Keener on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Robin P. Keener. (Keener, Robin)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Sean P. Donahue, Christopher C. French, Colin J. Keeler, Austin Lewis, Constance Lewis, Angela Marie Meisman, Vaughn W. Mongan, Amber Michelle Mooney, Quality T-Tops & Boat Accessories, Inc. (BD)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff's Counsels of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:21-cv-2959-SCB-AEP. (SJB)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number BFLMDC-19053804) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Auto-Owners Policy, #3 Exhibit B- Title History of Tesla S Plaid, #4 Exhibit C - Rein Estate Complaint, #5 Proposed Summons Quality T-Tops, #6 Proposed Summons Meisman Estate, #7 Proposed Summons Rein Estate, #8 Proposed Summons Mongan, #9 Proposed Summons Keeler, #10 Proposed Summons French, #11 Proposed Summons Constance Lewis, #12 Proposed Summons Austin Lewis, #13 Proposed Summons Donahue)(Keener, Robin) Modified on 12/22/2021 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Quality T-Tops & Boat Accessories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Robin Petronella Keener
Represented By: Matthew E. Strojnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUALITY T-TOPS & BOAT ACCESSORIES, INC.
Represented By: David J. Abbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA MARIE MEISMAN
Represented By: David J. Abbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER MICHELLE MOONEY
Represented By: Michael J. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN P. DONAHUE
Represented By: Robert Twombly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER C. FRENCH
Represented By: Robert Twombly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLIN J. KEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTANCE LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAUGHN W. MONGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?