Stewart v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Germain A. Stewart
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 8:2022cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #5 Report and Recommendation, dismissing the #1 Complaint without prejudice, and denying the #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint by March 3, 2022 or this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/17/2022. (EDB)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Germain A. Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/26/2022. (ACL)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING CIVIL CASE ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after Defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/4/2022. (EDB)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's complaint and motion practice. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/3/2022. (EDB)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Germain A. Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court WIthout Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form)(CRK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association with Jury Demand filed by Germain A. Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Pending Legal Action, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CRK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germain A. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?