Patricio v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kenneth Patricio
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2022cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's answer is now due on or before April 4, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 2, 2022. (AKA)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until April 4, 2022 by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
January 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kenneth Patricio. Related case(s): No (Cohen, Martin)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on January 4, 2022. (AKA)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (BD)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0005-WFJ-JSS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (SJB)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Kenneth Patricio. (Cohen, Martin)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Kenneth Patricio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Cohen, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricio v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Patricio
Represented By: Martin J. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?