Whiteman v. Kforce Inc.
Plaintiff: Sam Whiteman
Defendant: Kforce Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Mark A. Hanley
Case Number: 8:2022cv00056
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 7 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Kforce Inc.. (Jackson, Erin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Justin Curley to appear pro hac vice by Kforce Inc.. (Jackson, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
March 4, 2022 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Stephanie Delatorre to appear pro hac vice by Kforce Inc.. (Jackson, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
March 4, 2022 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Gina Merrill to appear pro hac vice by Kforce Inc.. (Jackson, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
March 4, 2022 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Christian Rowley to appear pro hac vice by Kforce Inc.. (Jackson, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
March 4, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sam Whiteman. Related case(s): Yes (Salas, Maureen)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part the motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #25). Based on the representation that Plaintiff will file an amended complaint by March 18, 2022 at the latest, the Court extends the time for Defendant to respond to April 1, 2022. The Court will be disinclined to extend this deadline further. None of the Scheduling Order's deadlines will be altered based on this extension. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/28/2022. (DMD)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #26 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Gina Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #27 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Justin Curley to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Christian Rowley to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and #29 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Stephanie Delatorre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It appears that counsel has not complied with Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 2/28/2022. (ACL)
February 25, 2022 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Stephanie Delatorre to appear pro hac vice by Kforce Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions)(Jackson, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 25, 2022 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Christian Rowley to appear pro hac vice by Kforce Inc. (Jackson, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 25, 2022 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Justin T. Curley to appear pro hac vice by Kforce Inc. (Jackson, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 25, 2022 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Gina Merrill to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19278623 for $150 by Kforce Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions)(Jackson, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 25, 2022 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Kforce Inc. (Jackson, Erin)
February 15, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Consent to become a Party Plaintiff of Trinh Tran by Sam Whiteman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Salas, Maureen)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Mark A. Hanley, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than April 26, 2022. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by March 11, 2022. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/8/2022. (TWL)
February 7, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Consent to become a Party Plaintiff of Zacharey Slatowski by Sam Whiteman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Salas, Maureen)
February 4, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Under Local Rule 3.03 by Sam Whiteman (Salas, Maureen) Modified on 2/7/2022 (BES).
February 4, 2022 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 2/4/2022 by Sam Whiteman as to Kforce Inc. (Salas, Maureen)
February 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Maureen Ann Salas on behalf of Sam Whiteman. Lead Counsel: Maureen A. Salas. (Salas, Maureen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Consent to be a Party Plaintiff of Damon Marshall by Sam Whiteman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Salas, Maureen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Consent to be a Party Plaintiff of Rachael Trimboli by Sam Whiteman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Salas, Maureen)
January 25, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Consent to be a Party Plaintiff of Alexander Lomaglio and Gena Narcisco by Sam Whiteman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Salas, Maureen)
January 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Consent to be a Party Plaintiff of Brian Lonergan, Maxwell Olson, and Michael Blasche by Sam Whiteman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Salas, Maureen)
January 21, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Kforce Inc. (LNR)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's #9 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission [as to attorney Maureen A. Salas]; Plaintiff's #10 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission [as to attorney Michael M. Tresnowski]; Plaintiff's #11 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission [as to attorney Benjamin L. Davis, III]; and Plaintiff's #12 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission [as to Kelly A. Burgy]. If counsel have not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, they shall complete the e-filer registration (more information available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/20/2022. (ACL)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Kelly A. Burgy to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19138359 for $150 by Sam Whiteman. (Schott, Bernard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Benjamin L. Davis to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19138349 for $150 by Sam Whiteman. (Schott, Bernard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Michael M. Tresnowski to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19138339 for $150 by Sam Whiteman. (Schott, Bernard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Maureen A. Salas to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19138316 for $150 by Sam Whiteman. (Schott, Bernard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Sam Whiteman. (Schott, Bernard)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsels Maureen A. Salas, Michael Tresnowski, Benjamin L. Davis and Kelly A. Burgy of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff's Counsels of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:22-cv-0056-VMC-CPT. (SJB)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Collective Action Complaint) against Kforce Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19094864) filed by Sam Whiteman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Schott, Bernard) Modified on 1/7/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whiteman v. Kforce Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Whiteman
Represented By: Bernard K. Schott
Represented By: Maureen Ann Salas
Represented By: Benjamin L. Davis, III
Represented By: Kelly Anne Burgy
Represented By: Michael Mark Tresnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kforce Inc.
Represented By: Erin G. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mark A. Hanley
Represented By: Mark A. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?