Walkowiak et al v. National Hockey League
Plaintiff: David Walkowiak and James C. Watkins
Defendant: National Hockey League
Case Number: 8:2022cv00078
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on January 21, 2022 by David Walkowiak, James C. Watkins as to National Hockey League. (Hill, Brandon)
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Walkowiak, James C. Watkins. (Hill, Brandon)
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by David Walkowiak, James C. Watkins. Related case(s): Yes (Hill, Brandon)
January 13, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Hockey League with Jury Demand. filed by David Walkowiak, James C. Watkins. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by David Walkowiak, James C. Watkins.(Hill, Brandon)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER striking #1--complaint; directing the plaintiff to amend the complaint not later than 1/20/22. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/13/2022. (KRM)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c)and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2)-Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brandon J. Hill on behalf of David Walkowiak, James C. Watkins. Lead Counsel: Brandon J. Hill. (Hill, Brandon)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to National Hockey League. (BD)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0078-SDM-SPF. (SJB)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 *** STRICKEN PER ORDER #7*** COMPLAINT against National Hockey League with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19102980) filed by David Walkowiak, James C. Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hill, Brandon) Modified on 1/11/2022 to correct docket text (BD). Modified on 1/13/2022 (KRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walkowiak et al v. National Hockey League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walkowiak
Represented By: Brandon J. Hill
Represented By: Amanda E. Heystek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Watkins
Represented By: Brandon J. Hill
Represented By: Amanda E. Heystek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Hockey League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?