SFR Services, LLC v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: SFR Services, LLC
Defendant: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, FKS Insurance Services, LLC and Property Loss Specialist, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00109
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Andrew Erlandson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA066047.) Related document: #39 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew W. Erlandson to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Catherine White (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA066047.) Related document: #40 Unopposed MOTION for Catherine E. White to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Jamie Freilich, Susan Reagan Gittes, and Maeve L. O'Connor may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant United Property and Casualty Ins. Co. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c)(5).Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/4/2022. (DK)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Maeve L. O'Connor to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19301752 for $150 by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Zinober, Fredric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Susan Reagan Gittes to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19301728 for $150 by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Zinober, Fredric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Jamie Freilich to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19301696 for $150 by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Zinober, Fredric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed motions to appear pro hac vice (Docs. 39, 40). Attorneys Andrew Erlandson and Catherine White may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/2/2022. (ACS)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Catherine E. White to appear pro hac vice by Property Loss Specialist, LLC. (Dietrich, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew W. Erlandson to appear pro hac vice by Property Loss Specialist, LLC. (Dietrich, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Property Loss Specialist, LLC. (Dietrich, Daniel)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jounice Laverne Nealy-Brown on behalf of Property Loss Specialist, LLC. (Nealy-Brown, Jounice) Modified on 3/1/2022 to edit text (CRK).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants Property Loss Specialist, LLC's #34 unopposed motion for extension of time. Property Loss must respond to the complaint on or before March 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/28/2022. (EDB)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Schifino, Jr. on behalf of Property Loss Specialist, LLC. (Schifino, William) Modified on 2/28/2022 to edit text (CRK).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Amended Complaint by Property Loss Specialist, LLC. (Dietrich, Daniel)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Paul Dietrich on behalf of Property Loss Specialist, LLC. (Dietrich, Daniel) Modified on 2/28/2022 to edit text (CRK).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants the #30 and #31 unopposed motions for extension of time. FKS Insurance Services, LLC and United Property & Casualty Insurance Company must respond to the complaint on or before March 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/24/2022. (EDB)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #23 Amended Complaint by FKS Insurance Services, LLC. (Pasternack, Chad)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Zinober, Fredric) Modified on 2/23/2022 to convert to motion (CRK).
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Fredric S. Zinober on behalf of United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Zinober, Fredric) Modified on 2/18/2022 to edit text (CRK).
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Monteverde on behalf of United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Monteverde, Michael) Modified on 2/17/2022 to edit text (CRK).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS issued as to Property Loss Specialist, LLC. (CRK)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROPOSED summons to be issued by SFR Services, LLC. (Pelier, Robert)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SFR Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SFR Services L.L.C. for SFR Services, LLC. (Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/28/2022 to edit text (CRK).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by SFR Services, LLC. Related case(s): No (Pelier, Robert)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by SFR Services, LLC. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/26/2022 to edit text (CRK).
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of compliance re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter N. Kessler by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/26/2022 to edit text (CRK).
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of compliance re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Oliver D. Griffin by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/26/2022 to edit text (CRK).
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of compliance re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anna S. Forman by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/26/2022 to edit text (CRK).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motions to appear pro hac vice (Docs. 16, 17, 18). Attorneys Anna Forman, Peter Kessler, and Oliver Griffin may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/25/2022. (ACS)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED MOTION for Oliver D. Griffin to appear pro hac vice by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/19/2022 to edit text (CRK).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED MOTION for Peter N. Kessler to appear pro hac vice by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/19/2022 to edit text (CRK).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED MOTION for Anna S. Forman to appear pro hac vice by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/19/2022 to edit text (CRK).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Docs. 13, 14, 15). On February 1, 2021, the Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules became effective. Attorneys Forman, Griffin, and Kessler are directed to comply with the requirements set forth in the new Local Rule 2.01(c). In particular, Local Rule 2.01(c)(4) requires a lawyer moving for special admission in an action to "list each case in a state or federal court in Florida in which the lawyer has initially appeared in the last thirty-six months." Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/18/2022. (ACS)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Peter N. Kessler to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19130631 for $150 by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pelier, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Oliver D. Griffin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19130598 for $150 by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pelier, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Anna S. Forman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19130444 for $150 by SFR Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pelier, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review, the Court finds this complaint constitutes an impermissible shotgun pleading. See Weiland v. Palm Beach Cnty. Sheriff's Off., 792 F.3d 1313, 1320-23 (11th Cir. 2015). Specifically, Count IV alleges that United Property & Casualty Insurance Company violated multiple statutory sections without separating these acts into individual counts. Worse still, Count IV speculates that United Property violated other unnamed provisions of Florida law, which patently fails to satisfy the pleading requirements of Rule 8. This type of pleading does not give Defendant "adequate notice of the claims against [it] and the grounds upon which each claim rests." See id. Accordingly, the Court STRIKES Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint complying with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by January 26, 2022, or this action will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/14/2022. (EDB)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING CIVIL CASE ORDER. The parties shall file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within 40 days after any Defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/14/2022. (EDB)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE to counsels Oliver D. Griffin and Peter N. Kessler Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to FKS Insurance Services, LLC, Property Loss Specialist, LLC, United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (BD)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0109-KKM-SPF. (SJB)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by SFR Services, LLC. (Pelier, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by SFR Services, LLC. (Pelier, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by SFR Services, LLC. (Pelier, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 **STRICKEN DUE TO COURT ORDER AT DOC. 11** COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $402, Receipt #AFLMDC-19117950) filed by SFR Services, LLC.(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/13/2022 to correct docket text(SJB). Modified on 1/14/2022 to strike Complaint (CRK).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by SFR Services, LLC.(Pelier, Robert) Modified on 1/13/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFR Services, LLC v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR Services, LLC
Represented By: Oliver D. Griffin
Represented By: Peter N. Kessler
Represented By: Robert N. Pelier
Represented By: Anna S. Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Fredric S. Zinober
Represented By: Michael A. Monteverde
Represented By: Jaime Michelle Fried
Represented By: Maeve L. O'Connor
Represented By: Susan Reagan Gittes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FKS Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Chad A. Pasternack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Loss Specialist, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Paul Dietrich
Represented By: Andrew W. Erlandson
Represented By: Catherine E. White
Represented By: Jounice Laverne Nealy-Brown
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?