Hodges v. Hoffman (Sarasota)
Petitioner: John Hodges
Respondent: Kurt Hoffman
Case Number: 8:2022cv00163
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Kurt Hoffman (Attachments: #1 State's Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 State's Appendix, #3 Hodges' Reply)(Kayan, Bora)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing the Respondent to supplement the record with (1) the State's response to Hodges's state petition for writ of habeas corpus, (2) the State's appendix, and (3) Hodges's reply. Hodges v. Hoffman, No. 2D21-3536 (Fla. 2d DCA). The Respondent must comply within 5 DAYS. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/2/2022. (JT)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY re #15 Answer to Complaint, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by John Hodges. (Stevenson, Benjamin)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting Petitioner John Hodges's #16 unopposed motion to file excess pages. Hodges's reply shall not exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 2/28/2022. (JT)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages - 25-page Reply by John Hodges. (Stevenson, Benjamin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kurt Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kayan, Bora) Modified text on 2/22/2022 (ABC).
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Hodges and Hoffman's #13 motion proposing a briefing schedule and denying as moot Hodges's #6 emergency motion for expedited briefing. See the Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/8/2022. (JT)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Scheduling Order by John Hodges, Kurt Hoffman. (Kayan, Bora) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bora Sabih Kayan on behalf of Kurt Hoffman (Kayan, Bora)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by John Hodges. Kurt Hoffman served on 1/24/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (Stevenson, Benjamin) Modified text on 1/26/2022 (ABC).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing Kurt Hoffman to respond to #6 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Order Requiring a Prompt Responsive Pleading. Responses due by 2/4/2022. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Service Documents)(TDC)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Kurt Hoffman. (BD)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel Aaron Rogak Getty of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Larry Eger of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Order Requiring a Prompt Responsive Pleading by John Hodges. (Stevenson, Benjamin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by John Hodges. (Stevenson, Benjamin)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by John Hodges re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus of Filing Corrected State Court Order (ECF 1-3) (Attachments: #1 State Court Order (correcting ECF 1-3))(Stevenson, Benjamin)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:22-cv-0163-MSS-CPT. (SJB)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Hodges. (Stevenson, Benjamin)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 receipt number AFLMDC-19140707) filed by John Hodges. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Habeas Petition, #2 Exhibit State Habeas Appendix, #3 Exhibit State Court Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevenson, Benjamin) Modified on 1/21/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. Hoffman (Sarasota)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Hodges
Represented By: Benjamin James Stevenson
Represented By: Aaron Rogak Getty
Represented By: Daniel B. Tilley
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Azis
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Represented By: Larry Louis Eger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kurt Hoffman
Represented By: Bora Sabih Kayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?