Laster v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al(Polk County)
Petitioner: Tyrone Laster
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida
Case Number: 8:2022cv00723
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Respondent has 90 days to respond. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Service Documents)(TDC)
May 27, 2022 NOTICE: PLRA Filing fee has been paid in full for Tyrone Laster, Prisoner ID 473169. Florida Department of Corrections electronically notified. (JSR)
May 25, 2022 FEES Paid by Tyrone Laster, Prisoner ID 473169 (Filing fee $5.00, Receipt Number TPA066333). Balance in Cash Register indicates filing fee paid in full. Finance to verify balance. Payment received from source other than the DOC. (ARC)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding re: #6 by Tyrone Laster. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. In order to continue the prosecution of this case, Petitioner shall, within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order, pay $5.00 to the Clerk of the Court. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/29/2022. (LV)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tyrone Laster. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonya Roebuck Horbelt on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections (Horbelt, Sonya)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to file proof of indigency or submit the five-dollar filing fee. Proof of indigency or filing fee due by 4/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/30/2022. (LV)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Tyrone Laster. Related case(s): No (CTR)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tyrone Laster. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laster v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al(Polk County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrone Laster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Sonya Roebuck Horbelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General, State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?