Charroud v. Meryem et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Aziz Charroud and Aziz Charroud
Defendant: Princess Lalla Meryem, Housni Benslimane, Belkheir Al Farouk and Lalla Meryem
Case Number: 8:2022cv00854
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #32 Order on Motion to Set Aside Clerk Default, filed by Aziz Charroud. (Michel, Frantz)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #25 Defendants Princess Lalla Meryem, Housni Benslimane, and Belkheir Al Farouk's Motion to Set Aside the Entry of Default and Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details.Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/11/2022. (MTP)
September 26, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk Default and Motion to Dismiss filed by Belkheir Al Farouk, Housni Benslimane, Lalla Meryem. (Lowell, Abbe)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #29 Defendants, Princess Lalla Meryem, Housni Benslimane, and Belkheir Al Farouk's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Set Aside Default and Motion to Dismiss. Defendants may file an eight-(8)-page reply brief in support of their Motion to Set Aside Default and Motion to Dismiss within fourteen-(14)-days of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/12/2022. (MTP)
September 8, 2022 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of #25 Motion to Set Aside Default and Motion to Dismiss by Belkheir Al Farouk, Housni Benslimane, Lalla Meryem. (Lowell, Abbe)
August 31, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk Default and Motion to Dismiss, #17 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Belkheir Al Farouk , #18 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Housni Benslimane filed by Aziz Charroud. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Michel, Frantz)
August 24, 2022 Filing 27 ***TERMINATED-DOCUMENT NOT SIGNED AND INCORRECT EVENT USED - LEFT MESSAGE FOR COUNSEL TO REFILE WITH "S" SIGNATURE*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aziz Charroud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit)(Michel, Frantz) Modified on 8/25/2022 (LSS).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Abbe David Lowell may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/10/2022. (SFC)
August 9, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk Default and Motion to Dismiss by Belkheir Al Farouk, Housni Benslimane, Lalla Meryem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Fouad Lahmar))(Lowell, Abbe)
August 9, 2022 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Abbe David Lowell to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19865751 for $150 by Belkheir Al Farouk, Housni Benslimane, Lalla Meryem. (Lowell, Abbe) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 8, 2022 Filing 23 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Belkheir Al Farouk (LSS)
July 8, 2022 Filing 22 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Housni Benslimane (LSS)
July 8, 2022 Filing 21 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lalla Meryem (LSS)
July 6, 2022 Filing 20 APPENDIX re 6 Notice of exparte filing by Aziz Charroud. (Michel, Frantz)
July 6, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Lalla Meryem by Aziz Charroud. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Michel, Frantz) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 6, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Housni Benslimane by Aziz Charroud. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Michel, Frantz) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 6, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Belkheir Al Farouk by Aziz Charroud. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Michel, Frantz) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 1, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF of service by Aziz Charroud (Michel, Frantz)
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF of service by Aziz Charroud (Michel, Frantz)
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Aziz Charroud (Michel, Frantz)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT. COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by Aziz Charroud (Michel, Frantz) Modified on 6/10/2022 (LSS).
June 9, 2022 Filing 12 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT. COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by Aziz Charroud (Michel, Frantz) Modified on 6/10/2022 (LSS).
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT. COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"*** PROOF of service by Aziz Charroud (Michel, Frantz) Modified on 6/10/2022 (LSS).
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Belkheir Al Farouk, Housni Benslimane, Lalla Meryem. (LD)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Aziz Charroud. (Michel, Frantz)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Aziz Charroud. (Michel, Frantz)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Aziz Charroud. (Michel, Frantz)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 ***TERMINATED-COUNSEL TO REFILE WITH INIDIVIUAL PROPOSED SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT*** PROPOSED summons to be issued by Aziz Charroud. (Michel, Frantz) Modified on 6/1/2022 (LSS).
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to All Defendants on 04192022 by Aziz Charroud. (Michel, Frantz)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:22-cv-0854-MSS-AAS. (SJB)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19443384) filed by Aziz Charroud. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Michel, Frantz) Modified on 4/12/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charroud v. Meryem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Aziz Charroud
Represented By: Frantz Michel, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziz Charroud
Represented By: Frantz Michel, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Lalla Meryem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housni Benslimane
Represented By: Abbe David Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belkheir Al Farouk
Represented By: Abbe David Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lalla Meryem
Represented By: Abbe David Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?