Venkataperumal et al v. Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dr. Satish Venkataperumal, Priya Venkataperumal and Satish Venkataperumal
Defendant: Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00929
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PVMSI may have until July 5, 2022 to file an answer or response. PVMSI is cautioned that it may not appear pro se, and may only appear in court through licensed counsel. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/18/2022. (Jung, William)
June 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw re #15 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc.. The Clerk will terminate attorneys Solomon and Howard. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/18/2022. (Jung, William) Modified on 6/18/2022 (Jung, William).
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. of Non-Objection to SolomonLaw's Withdrawal as Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Solomon, Stanford)
June 15, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. by Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Solomon, Stanford)
June 15, 2022 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Solomon, Stanford)
June 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE Intent to Withdraw as Counsel for Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. by Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. (Solomon, Stanford)
May 20, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Stanford R. Solomon on behalf of Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. Lead Counsel: Stanford R. Solomon. (Solomon, Stanford)
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to complaint. Response due by 6/15/2022. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/18/2022. (CCB)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura H. Howard on behalf of Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. (Howard, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File File Answer re #1 Complaint by Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. (Solomon, Stanford)
May 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanford R. Solomon on behalf of Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. (Solomon, Stanford)
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on April 25, 2022 by Satish Venkataperumal, Priya Venkataperumal as to Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. (Anthony, Stephenie)
April 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc. (BD). Modified on 4/22/2022 to correct filed date, attach PDF, and regenerated NEF (BD).
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0929-WFJ-JSS. (SJB)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc.(Filing Fee $402, Receipt #AFLMDC-19483505) filed by Satish Venkataperumal, Priya Venkataperumal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Proposed Summons)(Anthony, Stephenie) Modified on 4/21/2022 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venkataperumal et al v. Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Satish Venkataperumal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priya Venkataperumal
Represented By: Stephenie Biernacki Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satish Venkataperumal
Represented By: Stephenie Biernacki Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Value Management Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Stanford R. Solomon
Represented By: Laura H. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?