United Van Lines, LLC v. Starceski
Plaintiff: United Van Lines LLC and United Van Lines, LLC
Defendant: Stephen P Starceski and Stephen P. Starceski
Case Number: 8:2022cv00937
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 14706 Liability of Carriers Under Receipts and Bills of Lading
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/20/2022. (MTP)
May 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United Van Lines, LLC (McKnight, Taylor)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action and Notice of Defendant's Evasion of Service per Local Rule 1.07(c) by United Van Lines, LLC. Related case(s): No (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(McKnight, Taylor)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Kennedy McKnight on behalf of United Van Lines, LLC (McKnight, Taylor)
April 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Stephen P. Starceski. (BD)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:22-cv-0937-MSS-TGW. (SJB)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by United Van Lines LLC. (Rine, John)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen P. Starceski (Filing fee $402 receipt number BFLMDC-19487595) filed by United Van Lines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rine, John) Modified on 4/22/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Van Lines, LLC v. Starceski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Van Lines LLC
Represented By: John Austin Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Van Lines, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Hock
Represented By: Taylor Kennedy McKnight
Represented By: John Austin Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P Starceski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P. Starceski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?