Memorial Episcopal Church v. Plan B Arc, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Memorial Episcopal Church
Defendant: Plan B Arc, Inc., The Ravenswood Group, LLC, Jean Marie Thrower and Ravenswood Group Holdings LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv01147
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Memorial Episcopal Church. (Gerencir, Samantha)
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Memorial Episcopal Church. Related case(s): No (Gerencir, Samantha)
June 23, 2022 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on June 2, 2022 by Memorial Episcopal Church as to Ravenswood Group Holdings LLC. (Gerencir, Samantha)
June 17, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, by Plan B Arc, Inc. (BD)
June 17, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, by Jean Marie Thrower.(BD)
June 8, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 5/20/22 by Memorial Episcopal Church as to Plan B Arc, Inc. (LNR)
June 8, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 5/20/22 by Memorial Episcopal Church as to Jean Marie Thrower. (LNR)
June 8, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Memorial Episcopal Church. (Gerencir, Samantha)
June 8, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Memorial Episcopal Church. (Gerencir, Samantha)
May 31, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Ravenswood Group Holdings LLC. (BES)
May 27, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES against Plan B Arc, Inc., Jean Marie Thrower, Ravenswood Group Holdings LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Memorial Episcopal Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Summons Ravenswood Group Holdings)(Gerencir, Samantha)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 ***TERMINATED; contacted counsel to refile using proper event.*** NOTICE by Memorial Episcopal Church re #1 Complaint; Notice of Filing Corrected Complaint for Money Damages. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Summons Ravenswood Group Holdings)(Gerencir, Samantha) Modified text on 5/27/2022 (LNR).
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Samantha Marie Gerencir on behalf of Memorial Episcopal Church. Lead Counsel: Samantha M. Gerencir. (Gerencir, Samantha)
May 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Cyril V. Smith of Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
May 19, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Plan B Arc, Inc., The Ravenswood Group, LLC, Jean Marie Thrower. (BD)
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-1147-WFJ-SPF. (SJB)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19586231) filed by Memorial Episcopal Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Summons Plan B Inc., #9 Proposed Summons The Ravenswood Group LLC, #10 Proposed Summons Jean Marie Thrower)(Gerencir, Samantha) Modified on 5/19/2022 to correct docket text (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Memorial Episcopal Church v. Plan B Arc, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memorial Episcopal Church
Represented By: Samantha Marie Gerencir
Represented By: Cyril V. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plan B Arc, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ravenswood Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Marie Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravenswood Group Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?