Hattaway v. APYX Medical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: William E Hattaway and William E. Hattaway
Defendant: APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D Goodwin II, Tara Semb and Charles D. Goodwin, II
Case Number: 8:2022cv01298
Filed: June 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of compliance re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by William E. Hattaway (Cruz, Frank)
July 18, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of compliance re 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by William E. Hattaway (Sadler, Casey)
July 14, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of compliance re 22 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb (Kotler, Meredith)
July 14, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of compliance re 22 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb (Tracy, Marques)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion regarding service and further proceedings in accordance with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/12/2022. (CCB)
July 12, 2022 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Regarding Service and Further Proceedings Unopposed by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb. (Mehta, Jason)
July 12, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason Paul Mehta on behalf of APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb. Lead Counsel: Meredith E. Kotler. (Mehta, Jason)
July 8, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Casey E. Sadler on behalf of William E. Hattaway. Lead Counsel: Casey E. Sadler. (Sadler, Casey)
July 8, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by William E. Hattaway. (Sadler, Casey)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kotler and Attorney Tracy may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the electronic filing registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/7/2022. (CED)
July 7, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Marques Tracy to appear pro hac vice by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Fee Paid Receipt)(Mehta, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 7, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Meredith E. Kotler to appear pro hac vice by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Fee Paid Receipt)(Mehta, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Cruz and Attorney Sadler may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the electronic filing registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/7/2022. (CED)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying without prejudice #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motions fail to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). See Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(C)-(E). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/7/2022. (CED)
July 6, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Frank R. Cruz to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19746154 for $150 by William E. Hattaway. (Desmond, Leo) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 6, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Casey E. Sadler to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19746153 for $150 by William E. Hattaway. (Desmond, Leo) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 5, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb. (Mehta, Jason)
July 5, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, and [Proposed] Order Regarding Response to Complaint and Briefing Schedule by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb. (Mehta, Jason)
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Marques Tracy to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19739707 for $150 by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb. (Mehta, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Meredith E. Kotler to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19739651 for $150 by APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb. (Mehta, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Robisch on behalf of APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb (Robisch, Kyle)
July 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Paul Mehta on behalf of APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin, II, Tara Semb (Mehta, Jason)
June 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
June 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Tara Semb. (SEG)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Charles D. Goodwin, II. (SEG)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to APYX Medical Corporation. (SEG)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Leo W. Desmond, Esquire, Casey E. Sadler, Frank R. Cruz of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SEG)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Frank R. Cruz of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SEG)
June 6, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-1298-WFJ-SPF. (SJB)
June 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19644544) filed by William E. Hattaway. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Desmond, Leo) Modified text on 6/7/2022 (SEG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hattaway v. APYX Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Hattaway
Represented By: Leo Wassner Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Hattaway
Represented By: Casey E. Sadler
Represented By: Frank R. Cruz
Represented By: Leo Wassner Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APYX Medical Corporation
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Represented By: Kyle Robisch
Represented By: Marques Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Goodwin II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Semb
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Represented By: Kyle Robisch
Represented By: Marques Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Goodwin, II
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Represented By: Kyle Robisch
Represented By: Marques Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?