Polelle v. Byrd et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Polelle
Defendant: Cord Byrd and Ron Turner
Case Number: 8:2022cv01301
Filed: June 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement (unsigned) by Michael J. Polelle. (BD)
August 2, 2022 Filing 18 ***TERMINATED--DISCOVERY***Witness List by Ron Turner. (Gaillard, Ashley) Modified on 8/3/2022 (CTR). (CTR).
August 2, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ron Turner. (Gaillard, Ashley)
August 2, 2022 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Cord Byrd. (Davis, Ashley)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #8, #9--motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/18/2022. (GG)
July 18, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Michael J. Polelle. (BD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2022: #1 Signed Response, #2 Mailing Envelope) (CTR).
July 14, 2022 Filing 13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Cord Byrd. (Davis, Ashley)
July 13, 2022 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Ron Turner. (Bentley, Morgan)
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 ***TERMINATED-COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO RE-FILE WITH CORRECT EVENT CODE***Amended MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Ron Turner.(Bentley, Morgan) Modified on 7/13/2022 (CTR).
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 ***TERMINATED-COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO RE-FILE WITH THE CORRECT EVENT CODE*** MOTION to Alter Judgment , MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Appoint ad Litem , First MOTION to Supplement #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Ron Turner. (Bentley, Morgan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified on 7/13/2022 (CTR).
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Ron Turner. (Bentley, Morgan)
July 8, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Cord Byrd. (Davis, Ashley)
July 5, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 6/22/22 by Michael J. Polelle as to Ron Turner. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)
June 27, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 6/17/2022 by Michael J. Polelle as to Cord Byrd. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
June 23, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 6/17/2022 by Michael J. Polelle as to Cord Byrd. (CTR)
June 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley E. Davis on behalf of Cord Byrd (Davis, Ashley)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c)and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
June 6, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Cord Byrd, Ron Turner. (MCB)
June 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Requested) against Cord Byrd, Ron Turner Filing fee $402.00, receipt number TPA66623 filed by Michael J. Polelle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polelle v. Byrd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Polelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cord Byrd
Represented By: Ashley E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Turner
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Gaillard
Represented By: Morgan R. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?