Hooker v. Hernandez-Covington
Plaintiff: Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
Defendant: Virginia Maria Hernandez-Covington, Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Thomas Patrick Barber
Case Number: 8:2022cv01763
Filed: August 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8--motion for relief from judgment. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/1/2022. (DAS)
August 19, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Argument, #2 Exhibits)(JNB)
August 16, 2022 Filing 7 JUDGMENT in favor of Thomas Patrick Barber, Virginia Maria Hernandez-Covington against Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/16/2022. (MCB)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing action with prejudice; directing clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/15/2022. (DAS)
August 14, 2022 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit Order)(BD)
August 12, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Virginia Maria Hernandez-Covington, Thomas Patrick Barber with Jury Demand. Filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim - Continued, #2 Proposed Summons)(BD)
August 9, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit Order)(BD)
August 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
August 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Virginia Maria Hernandez-Covington with Jury Demand filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim - Part C Continued, #2 Proposed Summons) (Filing fee: Not paid; No IFP motion filed.) (AG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooker v. Hernandez-Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Maria Hernandez-Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia M. Hernandez Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Patrick Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?