Aponte v. Walmart Store East LP
Plaintiff: Yavier Aponte
Defendant: Walmart Store East LP and Walmart Store East LP doing business as Walmart Supercenter #859
Case Number: 8:2022cv01927
Filed: August 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice. After 30 days, dismissal shall be with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and to close this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/27/2022. (MEV)
September 26, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of settlement by Walmart Store East LP. (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
September 16, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Yavier Aponte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Vickaryous, James)
September 16, 2022 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Tanner, Madison)
September 16, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Propound Additional Interrogatories by Walmart Store East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Def's ROGS to Pltf, #2 Exhibit Exh. B - Def's Medicare ROGS to Pltf, #3 Exhibit Exh. C - Pltf's Obj to Def's Medicare ROGS)(Tanner, Madison)
September 2, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Standing Order, by Yavier Aponte. (Vickaryous, James)
September 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Yavier Aponte. Related case(s): Yes (Vickaryous, James)
September 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by James Gabriel Vickaryous on behalf of Yavier Aponte. Lead Counsel: James G. Vickaryous. (Vickaryous, James)
September 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of and Designation of Email Appearance by James Gabriel Vickaryous on behalf of Yavier Aponte (Vickaryous, James)
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Walmart Store East LP. Related case(s): No (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel James G. Vickaryous, Savanna N. Gaslin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SET)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER: The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after any defendant appears. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/23/2022. (MEV)
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Walmart Store East LP. (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
August 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda J. Sharkey Ross on behalf of Walmart Store East LP. Lead Counsel: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross. (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
August 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Allen Tanner on behalf of Walmart Store East LP (Tanner, Madison)
August 23, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-1927-KKM-SPF. (SJB)
August 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Polk County Clerk of Court, case number 22-CA-1165 filed in State Court on 04/08/22. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19915728 filed by Walmart Store East LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 State Court Other Documents Exh. C - Pltf's Ans. to ROGS redacted, #4 State Court ANSWER, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sharkey Ross, Amanda) Modified text on 8/24/2022 (SET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aponte v. Walmart Store East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yavier Aponte
Represented By: Savanna Nicole Gaslin
Represented By: James Gabriel Vickaryous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Store East LP
Represented By: Madison Allen Tanner
Represented By: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Store East LP doing business as Walmart Supercenter #859
Represented By: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross
Represented By: Madison Allen Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?